Maldonado v. Berryhill
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John Mcbryde |
Referred: | Jeffrey L Cureton |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00242 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Defendant
Nancy A Berryhill
|
|
Interested Party
Social Security Administration - Interested Party
|
|
Plaintiff
Julie Ann Maldonado
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment
Thu 06/14 1:34 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: The court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that the decisions of Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner, Social Security Administration, that, based on an application for a period of disability and disability insurance benefits filed by plaintiff, Julie Ann Maldonado, on January 9, 2013, plaintiff is not disabled under sections 216(i) and 223(d) of the Social Security Act, and that, based on the application for supplemental security income filed by plaintiff on January 9, 2013, plaintiff is not disabled under section 1614 (a) (3) (A) of the Social Security Act, be, and are hereby, affirmed. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 6/14/2018) (mpw) |
|
19 | 19
13
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Thu 06/14 1:32 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: The court accepts15 the recommendation of the magistrate judge and ORDERS that the decision of the Commissioner that, based on the application for a period of disability and disability insurance benefits filed on January 9, 2013, plaintiff is not disabled under sections 216(i) and 223(d) of the Social Security Act, and, based on the application for supplemental security income filed on January 9, 2013, plaintiff is not disabled under section 1614 (a) (3) (A) of the Social Security Act, be, and is hereby, affirmed. (see order for specifics) (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 6/14/2018) (mpw) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 05/31 3:23 PM
RESPONSE filed by Nancy A Berryhill re:16 Plaintiff's OBJECTIONS to15 Findings and Recommendations. (tln) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Tue 05/22 1:51 PM
ORDER: By 4pm on 5/31/2018 defendant file a response to Plaintiff's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Findings. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 5/22/2018) (wrb) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Objection to Findings and Recommendations
Mon 05/14 2:34 PM
Plaintiff's OBJECTIONS to15 Findings and Recommendations by Julie Ann Maldonado (wrb) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Wed 05/02 1:51 PM
Findings and Recommendations on Case re:1 Complaint,,,, filed by Julie Ann Maldonado. Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton no longer assigned to case. Objections to F&R due by 5/16/2018 re:1 Complaint,,,, (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 5/2/2018) (wrb) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Appellants Brief
Tue 08/15 12:04 PM
Defendant's BRIEF by Nancy A Berryhill. (bdb) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
Appellees Brief
Tue 07/18 10:27 AM
Plaintiff's BRIEF by Julie Ann Maldonado. (wrb) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Tue 06/20 10:46 AM
ORDER DIRECTING CASE TO BE TREATED AS AN APPEAL...this action treated as an appeal rather than determined on cross-motions for summary judgment.within 30 days from the date of this order, Pltf shall file brief setting forth errors that Pltf contends entitle Pltf to relief. See order for specifics. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 6/20/2017) (wrb) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/19 5:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Nancy A Berryhill. (wrb) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/19 5:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Nancy A Berryhill. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Kerry J Simpson added to party Nancy A Berryhill(pty:dft) (wrb) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Administrative Record
Mon 06/19 3:42 PM
Administrative Record consisting of Social Security record filed by Nancy A Berryhill. (Simpson, Kerry) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 12 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 13 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 14 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 15 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 16 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 17 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 18 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 19 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 20 Additional Page(s) | ||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Unfiling Pleading
Tue 06/13 8:49 AM
Order Unfiling7 Summons Returned due to the following deficiency: case not designated for electronic filing. re:7 Summons Returned (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 6/12/2017) (wrb) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned
Fri 06/09 12:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy A Berryhill ; served on 4/24/2017. (Bonino, Dominick) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipts | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/22 10:42 AM
Originals and Judge's Copies received pursuant to Standing Order re:2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement,1 Complaint,,,, filed by Julie Ann Maldonado (wrb) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 8:53 AM
Summons issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (tln) |
|
4 | 4
order
Paper Case Designation Order
Tue 03/21 8:46 AM
Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 3/21/2017) (tln) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
McBryde
Tue 03/21 8:44 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Cureton preliminarily assigned. File to Judge Cureton. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/20 4:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Julie Ann Maldonado. (Bonino, Dominick) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 4:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filed by Julie Ann Maldonado. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8287365) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bonino, Dominick) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |