Garza v. Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A., el al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Orlando L Garcia |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00217 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal - Fair Labor Standards |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 4:29 AM CDT |
Defendant
Alfonso Monarres
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claudia Garza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Judgment
Thu 04/26 3:30 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Dismiss
Fri 04/20 3:57 PM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A..(Rapp, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 04/16 12:35 PM
ORDER DENYING32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Dismiss
Tue 04/10 5:44 PM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A..(Rapp, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Agreed Judgment | ||
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 03/22 4:22 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL PAPERS, The parties shall submit a stipulation of dismissal or agreed judgment and any appropriate supporting documents on or before Friday, April 13, 2018. All pretrial deadlines in this case are hereby STAYED pending the submission of the parties' stipulation of dismissal or agreed judgment, and any appropriate supporting documents. Any motions pending in this action are DENIED, the pretrial conference and trial settings are cancelled, and no extensions of the above deadline shall be granted except upon a showing of good cause. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 03/16 9:56 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A., re28 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants" Motion for Summary Judgment DKT. 20 filed by Plaintiff Claudia Garza(Rapp, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Alternative Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 03/13 10:26 AM
Text Order GRANTING27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) |
||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 03/12 10:07 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A., re21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's FLSA Wage Claim filed by Defendant Alfonso Monarres, Defendant Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A. (Rapp, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 03/09 11:29 PM
Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants" Motion for Summary Judgment DKT. 20 by Claudia Garza.(Galo, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Sur-Reply, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 03/09 8:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to26 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A.. (Rapp, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 03/02 11:16 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Claudia Garza, re21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's FLSA Wage Claim filed by Defendant Alfonso Monarres, Defendant Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A.(Galo, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 03/02 9:52 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A., re20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Alfonso Monarres, Defendant Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A. (Rapp, Robert) |
|
24 | 24
respoth
Miscellaneous Objection
Fri 03/02 9:47 PM
Miscellaneous Objection to22 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A..(Rapp, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Supplement
Fri 02/23 11:53 PM
SUPPLEMENT to22 Response in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit - Proposed Order by Claudia Garza. (Galo, Michael) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 02/23 11:48 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Claudia Garza, re20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Alfonso Monarres, Defendant Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A.(Galo, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit | ||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Partial Summary Judgment
Fri 02/16 3:47 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's FLSA Wage Claim by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A..(Rapp, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Excerpts and Exhibits from Plaintiff's Deposition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Excerpts from Deposition of Dr. Monarres, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Declaration of Dr. Monarres, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Plaintiff's Disclosures, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
misc
Remark (No Doc#)
Tue 02/13 1:48 PM
Remark: CD Disc Exhibit #9 to Motion for Summary Judgment forwarded to the Court with Courtesy Copy of Transcript for Court Viewing. File Copy placed in Clerk's File Area. (wg) |
||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Partial Summary Judgment
Fri 02/09 3:16 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A..(Rapp, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Vol 1 Plaintiff's Deposition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Vol 2 Plaintiff's Deposition, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 Vol 3 Plaintiff's Deposition, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 Exhibits to Plaintiff's Deposition, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 Dr. Monarres Deposition, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 Declaration of Dr. Monarres, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 Declaration of B. Mata, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 Declaration of J. Polasek, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 6 Declaration of J. Sorola, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 Declaration of B. Kincaide, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 8 Dep Written Questions (Custodian) & Records, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 9 Audio Recording Placeholder, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 10 Transcript of Audio Recording, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 11 Plaintiff's Disclosures, | ||
Att: 15 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
trial
Expert Witness List
Fri 11/03 12:14 PM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A..(Rapp, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 10/26 1:51 PM
Text Order GRANTING18 Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the scheduling order deadlines are revised as follows: The parties shall complete all discovery on or before Wednesday, January 17, 2018. Counsel may by agreement continue discovery beyond the deadline, but there will be no intervention by the Court except in extraordinary circumstances, and no trial setting will be vacated because of information obtained in post-deadline discovery. All dispositive motions shall be filed no later than Friday, February 16, 2018. Dispositive motions as defined in Local Rule CV-7(h) and responses to dispositive motions shall be limited to 20 pages in length.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ju) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 10/26 2:20 PM
Re-Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 1/17/2018, Dispositive Motions due by 2/16/2018, (wg) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Tue 10/24 4:47 PM
Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A.. (Rapp, Robert) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Mon 10/23 9:25 AM
STIPULATION Stipulation of the Parties by Claudia Garza. (Galo, Michael) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Advisory to the Court
Thu 10/19 5:00 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Claudia Garza. (Galo, Michael) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Exclude
Fri 10/13 4:00 PM
MOTION to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Plaintiff's Designated Medical Experts by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A..(Rapp, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 3 Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
trial
Expert Witness List
Fri 09/29 3:16 PM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Claudia Garza.(Galo, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 08/31 11:28 AM
Text Order GRANTING12 Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. Accordingly, Paragraphs 3 and 4 of the Scheduling Order are amended to read as follows: 3. The Parties shall file all motions to amend or supplement pleadings or to join additional parties by Monday, November 6, 2017. 4. All parties asserting claims for relief shall FILE their designation of testifying experts and SERVE on all parties, but not file, the materials required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B) by Friday, September 29, 2017. Parties resisting claims for relief shall FILE their designation of testifying experts and SERVE on all parties, but not file, the materials required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B) by Friday, November 3, 2017. All designations of rebuttal experts, to the extent not already served, shall be SERVED, within 14 days of receipt of the report of the opposing expert.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 09/01 8:52 AM
Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2017, Joinder of Parties due by 11/6/2017, (wg) |
||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
4
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/30 4:04 PM
AGREED CONFIDETIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re11 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A.. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Wed 08/30 1:22 PM
Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A.. (Rapp, Robert) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Wed 08/30 10:23 AM
Text Order GRANTING11 Agreed Motion for Protective Order entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) |
||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Protective Order
Mon 08/28 5:56 PM
Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A..(Rapp, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Agreed Confidentiality and Protective Order | ||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
trial
Expert Witness List
Fri 08/11 2:39 PM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Claudia Garza. (Galo, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
adr
ADR Report - Other
Thu 06/29 3:05 PM
ADR Report Filed - Jointly by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A.(Rapp, Robert) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 05/15 3:38 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A.. (Rapp, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/09 2:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER, ( ADR Mediation Completed by 2/15/2018,, ADR Report Deadline due by 7/1/2017,, Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2017,, Discovery due by 12/15/2017,, Joinder of Parties due by 9/11/2017,, Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2018,, Jury Selection set for 5/7/2018 09:30AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia,, Jury Trial set for 5/7/2018 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia,, Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2018 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia,) Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 04/27 5:15 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Claudia Garza. (Galo, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/25 1:05 PM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Claudia Garza. (Galo, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial
Mon 04/24 9:17 AM
Order & Advisory for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within forty five (45) days of the filing of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 04/21 10:42 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to2 Amended Complaint by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A..(Rapp, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/21 12:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Claudia Garza.(Galo, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/20 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A., d/b/a Stone Ridge Dental (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9408390), filed by Alfonso Monarres, Alfonso Monarres, D.D.S., M.S., P.A., d/b/a Stone Ridge Dental.(Rapp, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/20 3:13 PM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Mon 03/20 3:14 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr) |