Hebl, Katherine v. Windeshausen, Bradley
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | William M Conley |
Referred: | Stephen L Crocker |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00218 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:1334 Bankruptcy Appeal |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 5:08 AM CDT |
Appellant
Katherine J. Hebl
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Bradley A. Windeshausen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment
Thu 10/04 11:17 AM
JUDGMENT entered affirming the decision of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Wisconsin. (kwf) |
|
11 | 11
14
pgs
order
Order deciding Bankruptcy Appeal
Thu 10/04 10:39 AM
OPINION AND ORDER affirming Bankruptcy Court's denial of appellant Katherine Hebl's claim for nondischargeability re:2 Bankruptcy Appeal. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/4/2018. (kwf) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Brief in Reply
Mon 07/03 8:46 AM
Brief in Reply by Appellant Katherine J. Hebl in Support of2 Bankruptcy Appeal Record,6 Motion to Strike (Biegert, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/21 4:25 PM
Notice by Appellee Bradley A. Windeshausen Letter to the Court . (Swenson, Mart) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Brief in Reply
Tue 06/20 9:44 AM
Brief in Opposition by Appellee Bradley A. Windeshausen re:2 Bankruptcy Appeal Record. (Swenson, Mart) Modified on 6/20/2017: Corrected docketing event; motion no longer under advisement. (lak) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Affidavit
Thu 05/25 2:38 PM
Affidavit of Matthew A. Biegert filed by Appellant Katherine J. Hebl re:6 Motion to Strike (Biegert, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Statement of the Case with edits | ||
6 | 6
motion
Strike
Thu 05/25 2:27 PM
Motion to Strike4 Brief in Support by Appellant Katherine J. Hebl. Brief in Opposition due 6/8/2017. Brief in Reply due 6/15/2017. (Biegert, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Plaintiff-Appellant's Amended Brief | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Brief in Support
Thu 05/18 11:46 PM
Brief in Support of2 Bankruptcy Appeal Record, Plaintiff-Appellant's Appendix by Appellant Katherine J. Hebl (Biegert, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
respm
Brief in Support
Thu 05/18 11:43 PM
Brief in Support of2 Bankruptcy Appeal Record, by Appellant Katherine J. Hebl (Biegert, Matthew) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Supplement
Fri 05/05 4:37 PM
Supplement to2 Bankruptcy Appeal Record. (kwf) |
|
Att: 1 Transcript of Motion Hearing and First Day of Court Trial, | ||
Att: 2 Transcript of Motion Hearing and Second Day of Court Trial | ||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Bankruptcy Appeal Record
Tue 04/18 4:35 PM
Bankruptcy Appeal Record from Bankruptcy Court case number 1 15-00083 cjf. Documents from the Bankruptcy case can be found[LINK:here] . Brief in Support due 5/18/2017. Brief in Opposition due 6/19/2017. Brief in Reply due 7/3/2017. (kwf) |
|
Att: 1 Bankruptcy Court Docket, | ||
Att: 2 Appellant Designation of Items, | ||
Att: 3 Appellee Designation of Items | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Tue 03/21 11:12 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) |
||
utility
Standard Attachments Sent
Tue 03/21 11:12 AM
Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (kwf) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal
Mon 03/20 11:40 AM
Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. Bankruptcy Court case number 15-83, filed by Katherine J. Hebl, (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Decision Dated 2/29/2016, | ||
Att: 2 Order Dated 2/29/2016, | ||
Att: 3 Decision Dated 3/3/2017, | ||
Att: 4 Order Dated 3/3/2017, | ||
Att: 5 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet |