A Rents
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | William J Lafferty |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40775 |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Dismissed: | May 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 19, 2017 |
Debtor
A Rents
1934 1st St
Livermore, CA 94550-4400 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Lois I. Brady
P.O. Box 12425
Oakland, CA 94604 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Docket last updated: 03/21/2017 12:02 AM PDT |