Montufar v. Phillips & Cohen Associates Limited
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Steven P Logan |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00824 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:02 AM MST |
Defendant
Phillips & Cohen Associates Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miriam Montufar
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago |
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 06/21 4:42 PM
ORDER - No stipulation to dismiss having been filed, in accordance with the Court's May 4, 2017 Order (Doc.12 ), IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 6/21/17. (LAD) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 05/04 10:37 AM
ORDER re:11 Notice of Settlement: This case will be dismissed with prejudice on June 16, 2017, unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 5/4/17. (CLB) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 05/04 8:35 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Miriam Montufar.(McGlothlin, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/17 1:29 PM
ORDER that the Motion for Extension of Time9 is granted. Defendant shall have until May 4, 2017, to file an answer to the Complaint or otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/17/17.(CLB) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/17 9:46 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Phillips & Cohen Associates Limited.(Richard, Damian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service Executed
Thu 04/13 3:50 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Miriam Montufar: re: Summons and Complaint upon Defendant Phillips & Cohen Associated Ltd on 03/29/17. (McGlothlin, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/12 12:07 PM
ORDER denying Defendant's6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/12/17.(CLB) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 04/11 4:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Phillips & Cohen Associates Limited.(Richard, Damian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Mon 03/20 2:21 PM
PRELIMINARY ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/20/17. (CLB) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 12:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Phillips & Cohen Associates Limited. (ATD) |
|
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 03/20 12:34 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14030411. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-00824 PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ATD) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Mon 03/20 12:33 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Miriam Montufar. (submitted by David McGlothlin) (ATD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14030411 filed by Miriam Montufar. (submitted by David McGlothlin) (ATD) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |