Hidalgo et al v. Avagyan et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00825 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:17 AM MST |
Defendant
Karen Avagyan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Avagyan
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Jose Luis Hidalgo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonel Guadalupe Pena Otero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arminda Otero Rabago
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 04/19 9:40 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to37 Order regarding filing a stipulation of dismissal, the civil case is terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 03/09 1:18 PM
ORDER - This matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. All pending hearings and deadlines are vacated. All pending motions are found to be moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate this matter on April 9, 2018 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 03/09/2018. (KAS) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 03/08 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to All Plaintiffs by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual). (Steele, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 03/06 2:38 PM
ORDER pursuant to34 Stipulation: Discovery due by 3/16/2018. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/2018. (DGC, nvo) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation
Mon 03/05 3:56 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Deadlines (First Request) by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual).(Steele, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Fri 03/02 6:46 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual). (Jaffe, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 02/21 1:03 PM
ORDER - This matter will be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order by Plaintiffs Jose Luis Hidalgo and Leonel Guadalupe Pena Otero, only, as to all Defendants unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. All pending hearings and deadlines are vacated as to Plaintiffs Jose Luis Hidalgo and Leonel Guadalupe Pena Otero, only. All pending motions are found to be moot as to Plaintiffs Jose Luis Hidalgo and Leonel Guadalupe Pena Otero, only. The Clerk is directed to terminate Plaintiffs Jose Luis Hidalgo and Leonel Guadalupe Pena Otero, only, on March 22, 2018 without further leave of Court. Plaintiff Arminda Otero Rabago remains as Plaintiff in this case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 02/20/2018. (KAS) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 02/14 5:53 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Plaintiffs Jose Luis Hidalgo and Leonel Guadalupe Pena Otero Only by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual), Unknown Avagyan. (Steele, Stephen) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Fri 01/19 6:25 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual), Unknown Avagyan. (Steele, Stephen) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Fri 01/12 4:39 PM
*NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual). (Steele, Stephen) *Modified to remove filer on 1/12/2018 (DXD) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 12/15 4:44 PM
NOTICE re: Defendants Trans Express and Karen Avagyan's Notice of Service of Designation of Expert Witnesses by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual), Unknown Avagyan . (Jaffe, Steven) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions
Thu 12/07 3:24 PM
REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions Joint by Jose Luis Hidalgo, Leonel Guadalupe Pena Otero, Arminda Otero Rabago. (Catanese, David) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 11/21 4:55 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephone Conference held on 11/21/2017. ( see documents for details) (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 2:31 PM to 2:47 PM.(TCA) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 11/20 10:45 AM
ORDER. A telephonic discovery conference call is set for 11/21/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. The Court will initiate the call to counsel at 2:25 p.m. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/20/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 11/13 4:30 PM
NOTICE re: Vacating Videotaped Deposition of Arminda Otero Rabago by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual), Unknown Avagyan . (Jaffe, Steven) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Deposition
Mon 11/06 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Arminda Otero Rabago, filed by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual), Unknown Avagyan. (Jaffe, Steven) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 11/02 4:05 PM
NOTICE re: Service of Defendants' Fourth Supplemental FRCP 26(a) Disclosure Statement by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual), Unknown Avagyan . (Jaffe, Steven) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 11/02 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual), Unknown Avagyan. (Jaffe, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 09/20 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual). (Steele, Stephen) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/08 4:35 PM
NOTICE re: Defendants Notice of Service of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) Disclosure Statements and 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures of Documents and Witnesses by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual) . (Steele, Stephen) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/08 4:33 PM
NOTICE re: Defendants' Notice of Service of Subpoenas Duces Tecum by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual) . (Steele, Stephen) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Fri 09/08 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual). (Steele, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 09/07 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jose Luis Hidalgo, Leonel Guadalupe Pena Otero, Arminda Otero Rabago. (Catanese, David) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 07/27 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jose Luis Hidalgo, Leonel Guadalupe Pena Otero, Arminda Otero Rabago. (Catanese, David) |
|
Saturday, June 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)
Sat 06/24 12:47 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by David Joseph Catanese. (Catanese, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/21 5:09 PM
NOTICE re: Claim of Non-Party at Fault by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual), Unknown Avagyan and Karen Avagyan dba Trans Express . (Steele, Stephen) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/05 3:31 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 3/2/2018. Dispositive motions due by 3/30/2018. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/5/2017. (TCA) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
minutes
Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Wed 05/31 4:42 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Scheduling Conference held on 5/31/2017. Discussion held. Deadlines discussed. Court will enter a case management order. APPEARANCES: David Catanese for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by Stephen Steele for Defendants (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:16 PM to 4:24 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 05/24 4:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Scheduling Conference RESET for 5/31/2017 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 05/23 4:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, Scheduling Conference RESET TIME ONLY for 5/25/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)
Tue 05/16 1:59 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jose Luis Hidalgo, Leonel Guadalupe Pena Otero, Arminda Otero Rabago.(Catanese, David) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 04/06 11:42 AM
ORDER re Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/6/2017. (DGC, nvo) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/30 9:37 AM
NOTICE re: of Service of Court's Order dated March 29, 2017 by Jose Luis Hidalgo, Leonel Guadalupe Pena Otero, Arminda Otero Rabago .(Catanese, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Wed 03/29 10:31 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/29/2017. (DGC, nvo) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/23 5:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan(an adult individual), Unknown Avagyan identifying Corporate Parent Trans Express for Karen Avagyan, Karen Avagyan, Unknown Avagyan. (Steele, Stephen) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/20 2:33 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Karen Avagyan (an adult individual) doing business as Trans Express. (ATD) |
|
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 03/20 2:25 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14030428. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-00825 PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ATD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/20 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2016-054782. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14030428 filed by Karen Avagyan(Wife) and Karen Avagyan(an adult individual) doing business as Trans Express. (submitted by Steven Jaffe) (ATD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Records, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Service Executed
Mon 03/20 2:16 PM
*****State Court records received on 3/17/2017*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jose Luis Hidalgo, Leonel Guadalupe Pena Otero, Arminda Otero Rabago: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Defendant Avagyan individually and dba Trans Express via certified mail on 01/05/2017.*****Affidavit of Service from State Records docketed in the U.S. District Court on 3/17/2017 for case management purposes.***** (ATD) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/20 2:22 PM
*****State Court record received on 3/17/2017*****ANSWER to Complaint re:1 Notice of Removal by Karen Avagyan(Wife), Karen Avagyan (an adult individual) dba Trans Express.*****Filed in State Court on 2/22/2017, docketed in U.S. District Court on 3/17/2017 for case management purposes.***** (ATD) |