Cortez v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00828 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:32 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Cortez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Mon 10/26 5:57 PM
ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice of Plaintiffs (doc.21659 in Lead MDL 15-2641 . The Claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/26/20. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Change of Email Address Only (Attorney)
Thu 11/30 8:06 AM
*NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS by Henry Gilbert Garrard, III. (Garrard, Henry) *Document filed in the wrong case. Attorney re-filed document in correct case on 11/30/2017 (LSP) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 03/20 12:47 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-828-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 12:46 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14032189 filed by Joshua Cortez.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |