Luchkiw v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00830 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:07 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua P Luchkiw
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
orderM
Order Amending Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Wed 04/01 8:25 AM
Remark - Case transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) |
||
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
30+
pgs
orderM
Order Amending Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Mon 03/23 12:25 PM
AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
30+
pgs
orderM
Order Amending Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Thu 03/19 1:19 PM
AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
30+
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Tue 03/17 8:35 AM
ORDER - SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (SLQ) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/20 3:55 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 3:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Submitted
Mon 03/20 3:37 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Joshua P Luchkiw.(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 03/20 3:33 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-830-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/20 3:32 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Dorothy J Dohanics on behalf of Joshua P Luchkiw. (MAP) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Mon 03/20 3:31 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Joshua P Luchkiw. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX183410 filed by Joshua P Luchkiw.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Mon 03/20 3:55 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX183409 as to Dorothy J Dohanics. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |