Holmes v. Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | John J Tuchi |
Referred: | David K Duncan |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00834 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 12/19 10:19 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion is granted and, pursuant to the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc.19 ), this matter is dismissed with prejudice, with the parties each to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/19/17. (LAD) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 12/13 11:14 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE by Paul Penzone.(Uglietta, Ann) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 12/08 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Notice Of Settlement by Paul Penzone. (Uglietta, Ann) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 11/22 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul Penzone. (Uglietta, Ann) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Thu 11/09 2:35 PM
ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED denying Plaintiff's Motion for Lawyer (Doc.15 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED providing Plaintiff with the name and address for Defendants' counsel: Ann Thompson Uglietta, Maricopa County Attorneys Office, Civil Services Division, 222 N. Central Ave., Suite 1100, Phoenix, AZ 85004, 602-506-8581, email: uglietta@mcao.maricopa.gov. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 11/9/17. (LAD) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 10/17 3:27 PM
MOTION for Lawyer by Jesse Allen Holmes. (LAD) (1 page, same PDF as14 ) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Change of Address (Party)
Tue 10/17 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jesse Allen Holmes: #318935, 2-B-19-U, ASPC-Tucson, Manzanita Unit, PO Box 24401, Tucson, AZ 85734-4401. (LAD) (1 page) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 10/02 2:19 PM
SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery due by 1/3/2018. Dispositive motions due by 3/4/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/3/2018. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 10/2/17. (LAD) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 10/02 12:35 PM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand DEFENDANT MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF PAUL PENZONES ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [DOC. 7] And DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by Paul Penzone.(Uglietta, Ann) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service Executed
Wed 08/23 3:48 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED : Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 08/03/2017 to Paul Penzone. (KAS) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Mon 07/17 1:03 PM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments of Remaining Balance be made from Prison Account of Jesse Allen Holmes. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/17/17. (DXD) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order (Service Packet) ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 07/17 1:01 PM
ORDER (Service Packet) - Defendants Wilson, Bretado, and Does 1-4 are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Penzone must answer the First Amended Complaint. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a service packet including the First Amended Complaint (Doc.7 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Penzone. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/17/17. (DXD) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Change of Address (Party)
Mon 06/05 12:19 PM
NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jesse Allen Holmes: #318935, 4-B-2-U, ASPC Tucson / Winchester Unit, P O Box 24407, Tucson, AZ 85734 (1 page). (DXD) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 05/22 3:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paul Penzone, Unknown Wilson, Unknown Bretado, Unknown Parties filed by Jesse Allen Holmes. (12 pages)(KAS) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Wed 04/26 10:31 AM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Jesse Allen Holmes. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/26/17. (SLQ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 04/26 10:29 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc.2 ) is granted. The Complaint (Doc.1 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/26/17. (SLQ) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment
Mon 03/20 4:59 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (ATD) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Mon 03/20 4:59 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jesse Allen Holmes. (ATD) (2 pages) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 4:58 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jesse Allen Holmes. (ATD) (2 pages) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 4:58 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Jesse Allen Holmes. (ATD) (7 pages) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |