Hernandez v. Burley et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Raner C Collins |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00126 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Clerks Judgment
Thu 08/24 12:22 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed 5/18/17, the complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice. This dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 USC § 1915(g).(BAC) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Thu 05/18 4:10 PM
ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE: IT IS ORDERED the Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections or designee must collect $350 filing fee from Plaintiff's trust account in monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to the account. Payments must be forwarded to the Clerk of Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10. Clerk must serve by mail a copy of this Order on the Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections, 1601 West Jefferson, Phoenix, Arizona, 85007, and provide a copy to Financial Administration for the Tucson Division of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 5/17/17.(BAC) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 05/18 4:07 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's7 second Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay $350 filing fee and is not assessed an initial partial filing fee. The1 Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. Failure to comply will result in, without further notice, a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 USC § 1915(g). Clerk must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 5/17/17.(BAC) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 05/16 4:52 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Pablo Isaac Hernandez. (BAC) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 05/16 4:51 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Pablo Isaac Hernandez. (2 pages).(BAC) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 04/19 1:03 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Pablo Isaac Hernandez. Reason for return: No Longer at the Pima County Jail. Document number 3. (BAR) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/14 4:37 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 4/14/2017. (See Order for complete details) (DPS) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Change of Address (Party)
Wed 04/05 2:38 PM
NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Pablo Isaac Hernandez: #245751, 5-A-9L, ASPC Yuma/Cheyenne, PO Box 8909, San Luis, AZ 85349. (DPS) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment
Mon 03/20 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (FKD) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 3:03 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Pablo Isaac Hernandez. (7 pages)(FKD) |
|
Att: 1 Application | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 3:02 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Pablo Isaac Hernandez. (6 pages)(FKD) |
|
Att: 1 envelope |