U.S. Attorney for Calif. v. Unknown and Known Terrorist and Organized Crime Members et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02076 |
Nature of Suit | 376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a)) |
Cause | 31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2017 1:26 AM PST |
Defendant
Mrs. K. Brown
|
|
Defendant
Governor Mary Fallin
|
|
Defendant
Unknown and Known Terrorist and Organized Crime Members
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Cotner
ODOC 93780 ex rel Joseph Harp Correctional Center A-2 - 120 PO Box 548
Lexington, OK 73051 |
|
Plaintiff
U.S. Attorney for Calif.
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 09/07 3:25 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal10 CCA # 17-55654 The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered August 15, 2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Wed 08/16 1:12 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals10 filed by Robert Cotner. CCA # 17-55654 We(9th CCA) deny appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, see 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a), and dismiss this appeal asfrivolous. [See document for all details.](mat) |
|
Sunday, June 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Striking Filed Documents (CV-80)
Thu 06/08 10:04 AM
ORDER STRIKING FILED DOCUMENTS FROM THE RECORD by Judge Percy Anderson: the documents listed below were improperly filed for the following reasons: case is closed as of 3/26/17; therefore, the following document(s) shall be stricken from the record and shall not be considered by the Court: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Agents of Defendants NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Compel them to Pay Filing and Appeals Fees14 . (mrgo) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 06/02 1:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court is in receipt of a Motion for Sanctions filed by plaintiff on May 9, 2017. (Docket No.14 .) This Motion was mistakenly filed, as this case was closed on March 26, 2017. (See Docket No.6 .) Accordingly, plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions is stricken from the record and will not be considered by the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
Appeal Remark
Wed 05/17 3:09 PM
Letter requesting the In Forma Pauperis Form re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals10 . [Form has been mailed to Petitioner. ] (mat) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Sanctions Order
Thu 05/18 11:14 AM
MOTION for Sanctions - Agents of Defendants and Compel them to Pay Filing and Appeals Fees filed by Plaintiff Robert Cotner. (lom) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Fri 05/05 4:42 PM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-55654 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals10 as to Plaintiff Robert Cotner. (mat) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
Filing Fee Letter (A-15CV)
Thu 05/04 4:49 PM
FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiff Robert Cotner, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals10 . (mat) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Thu 05/04 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Robert Cotner. Appeal of Order on Motion for Reconsideration9 Filed On: 4/18/17; Entered On: 4/20/17; Filing fee $ 505 billed. (mat) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Reconsideration
Thu 04/20 4:28 PM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER by Judge Percy Anderson re:7 MOTION for Reconsideration. (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)
Fri 04/14 1:57 PM
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Percy Anderson, ORDERING Notices to Chief Judge submitted by Plaintiff Robert Cotner received on 4/3/17 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: The case was dismissed on 3/26/17. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Reconsideration
Wed 04/12 11:37 AM
MOTION to Reconsider filed by Plaintiff Robert Cotner.6 (bem) |
|
Sunday, March 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/27 12:39 PM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES2 by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is: DENIED, and this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Miscellaneous)
Fri 03/24 11:37 AM
RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Re REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis2 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(bem) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 10:08 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 10:08 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 10:07 AM
AFFIDAVIT FOR FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Plaintiff Robert Cotner. (car) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/20 10:05 AM
COMPLAINT against Defendants K. Brown, Mary Fallin, Unknown and Known Terrorist and Organized Crime Members. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, filed by Plaintiff Robert Cotner. (car) |