Shirley Lindsay v. Carey-Antioch, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Philip S Gutierrez |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02153 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:39 AM PDT |
Defendant
Carey-Antioch, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Lindsay
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 07/26 10:23 AM
ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that the parties will file a Joint Stipulation for Dismissal within 60 days. The Court sets a Status Conference/OSC for September 25 at 2:00 pm at which the parties, by and through their attorneys of record shall show cause why this case is not dismissed. If this case is dismissed prior to this hearing, the hearing will be automatically vacated and no appearance shall be required. (bm) |
|
17 | 17
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 07/24 5:20 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to with prejudice filed by Planitiff Shirley Lindsay.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Settlement
Mon 07/17 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Settlement , jointly filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 07/06 3:50 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay.. (Price, Dennis) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 04/19 2:31 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2017 at 02:00 PM. (ab) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 04/18 3:37 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form6 served on April 10, 2017. (Potter, Mark) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 04/17 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Carey-Antioch, LLC, identifying Shirley Lindsay, Carey-Antioch, LLC. (Mangarpan, Tina) |
|
11 | 11
trial
Jury Demand
Mon 04/17 2:23 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Carey-Antioch, LLC.. (Mangarpan, Tina) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 04/17 2:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Carey-Antioch, LLC.(Attorney Tina I. Mangarpan added to party Carey-Antioch, LLC(pty:dft))(Mangarpan, Tina) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Wed 04/05 11:20 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (wm) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 1:18 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 12:28 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Carey-Antioch, LLC. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 12:19 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 12:19 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 7:27 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Planitiff Shirley Lindsay. (Handy, Russell) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 7:26 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, (Handy, Russell) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 7:25 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Handy, Russell) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 7:23 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19537939 - Fee: $400, filed by Planitiff Shirley Lindsay. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Shirley Lindsay(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) |