Peter King v. Amazon.Com Inc
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Beverly Reid O'Connell |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02154 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 28:1338 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 3:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Amazon.Com Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter King
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Mon 05/22 3:44 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing). (jp) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 05/19 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Peter King. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Magdaleno, Luis) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 04/20 2:42 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.Com Inc answer now due 5/26/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Amazon.Com Inc.(Attorney Bobby A Ghajar added to party Amazon.Com Inc(pty:dft))(Ghajar, Bobby) |
|
Saturday, April 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Sat 04/08 2:03 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peter King, upon Defendant Amazon.Com Inc served on 4/6/2017, answer due 4/27/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Leader Amazon.com Inc in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Magdaleno, Luis) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 04/03 12:19 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant Amazon.Com Inc. (jp) |
|
Saturday, April 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Summons Request
Sat 04/01 5:19 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Peter King. (Magdaleno, Luis) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Fri 03/31 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request12 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/30 11:33 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Peter King. (Magdaleno, Luis) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Thu 03/30 11:12 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Peter King. (Magdaleno, Luis) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Wed 03/29 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Vivek Jayaram to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Peter King (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19595755)8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt) |
|
9 | 9
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/29 4:13 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting8 Non-Resident Attorney Vivek Jayaram APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Peter King, designating Luis F Magdaleno as local counsel. (jp) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 03/29 1:11 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Vivek Jayaram to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Peter King (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19595755) filed by plaintiff Peter King. (Magdaleno, Luis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit CERTIFICATES OF ADMISSION, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) (Notice to Counsel) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 12:31 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 12:27 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 12:20 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Beverly Reid OConnell and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Peter King, identifying Amazon.com inc. (Magdaleno, Luis) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 10:16 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Peter King. (Magdaleno, Luis) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 9:40 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19538494 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Peter King. (Attorney Luis F Magdaleno added to party Peter King(pty:pla))(Magdaleno, Luis) |