Raffi Torossian v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Patrick J Walsh |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02163 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1444 Notice of Removal - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:37 AM PDT |
Defendant
Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Raffi Torossian
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 07/12 3:15 PM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL27 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice as to Defendant SLS, who is deemed to be the "prevailing party" in this action. Plaintiff shall take nothing by virtue of this action with respect to Defendant SLS. (lom) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 07/07 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,27(Ryan, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment of Dismissal | ||
29 | 29
judgmentCV
Judgment
Fri 07/07 3:17 PM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner,28 ,27 (pso) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Lodging
Thu 07/06 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,27 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 18(Minegar, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment of Dismissal | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Dismiss Case
Wed 06/28 9:42 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: WELLS FARGO'S MOTION TO DISMISS18 ; SLS's MOTION TO DISMISS20 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motions to Dismiss in their entirety. Refer to the Court's order for details. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (pso) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Tue 06/27 3:58 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Filed with Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Ryan, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 06/07 11:27 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Case18 ; and Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint20 , calendared for hearing on June 12, 2017, have been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Tue 05/30 3:22 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 20 filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Ryan, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Wed 05/24 3:00 PM
REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 18 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Minegar, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 05/23 11:21 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 18 filed by Plaintiff Raffi Torossian. (Rodriguez, Patricia) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 05/23 11:16 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 20 filed by Plaintiff Raffi Torossian. (Rodriguez, Patricia) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Thu 05/11 2:22 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/12/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Ryan, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice | ||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
For Judicial Notice
Tue 05/09 1:09 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 18 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Minegar, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 thru 13 to Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 05/09 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 6/12/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Minegar, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 05/01 2:12 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. According to court records, on April 27, 2017, plaintiff(s) filed an amended complaint16 . Therefore, defendants' Motions to Dismiss8 ,11 are denied as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Thu 04/27 11:34 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Raffi Torossian(Rodriguez, Patricia) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 04/26 7:44 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Complaint8 , calendared for hearing on May 1, 2017, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/17 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Non-Receipt of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Ryan, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/11 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Intent to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Raffi Torossian. (Rodriguez, Patricia) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
For Judicial Notice
Tue 04/04 11:42 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 11 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Minegar, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 thru 13 In Support of Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 04/04 11:38 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Minegar, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
10 | 10
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 04/04 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Raffi Torossian, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo and Company.(Attorney Andrew L Minegar added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Minegar, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 03/30 2:13 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for July 10, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (pso) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Mon 03/27 12:14 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/1/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Ryan, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/22 9:02 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. See Order for details. (sw) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 12:22 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 12:21 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/20 3:41 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, re Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 served on March 20, 2017. (Ryan, Timothy) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/20 3:31 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (Ryan, Timothy) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 3:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Ryan, Timothy) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 3:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court - Stanley Mosk, case number BC647033 Receipt No: 0973-19543433 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attorney Timothy M Ryan added to party Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft))(Ryan, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Notice of Assignment, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Notice of Acknowledgment and Receipt, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Proof of Service of Summons | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/21 11:51 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Raffi Torossian. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/13/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 3) (ghap) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 03/21 11:59 AM
NON CONFORM COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Raffi Torossian, upon Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC served on 1/27/2017, answer due 2/17/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Capitol Corporate Services Inc (C1990324) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 6) (ghap) |