L.A. Gem and Jewelry Design, Inc. v. Claires Boutiques, Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Suzanne H Segal |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02169 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
CBI Distributing Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Claires Accessories UK Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Claires Boutiques, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Claires Stores, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
L.A. Gem and Jewelry Design, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 06/23 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff L.A. Gem and Jewelry Design, Inc. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Anwandter, Jorge) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Thu 06/01 12:15 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing). (jp) |
|
Att: 1 Minutes Order Dismissing | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Dismissing Case
Thu 06/01 12:12 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge John F. Walter: As a result of the parties' failure to file the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as required by the Court's Order of 4/25/2017, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. The Scheduling Conference, currently on calendar for 6/12/2017, is VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Mon 05/22 9:19 AM
ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT18 by Judge John F. Walter. Th Court HEREBY ORDERS: The deadline for Defendants Claires Boutiques, Inc., Claires Stores, Inc., and CBI Distributing Corp. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended from May 19, 2017 to June 16, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Thu 05/18 3:07 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 16, 2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants CBI Distributing Corp., Claires Boutiques, Inc, Claires Stores, Inc.(Chow, Teresa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (L.R.7-1) | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 04/26 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CBI Distributing Corp., Claires Accessories UK Ltd, Claires Boutiques, Inc, Claires Stores, Inc, (Attorney Teresa C Chow added to party Claires Accessories UK Ltd(pty:dft), Attorney Teresa C Chow added to party Claires Stores, Inc(pty:dft))(Chow, Teresa) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Declaration
Wed 04/26 3:49 PM
DECLARATION of Teresa C. Chow Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendants CBI Distributing Corp., Claires Accessories UK Ltd, Claires Boutiques, Inc, Claires Stores, Inc. (Chow, Teresa) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/25 10:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 6/12/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before 5/30/2017. (jp) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 04/24 6:53 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to L.A. Gem and Jewelry Design, Inc answer now due 3/20/2017; CBI Distributing Corp. answer now due 3/20/2017; Claires Accessories UK Ltd answer now due 3/20/2017; Claires Boutiques, Inc answer now due 3/20/2017; Claires Stores, Inc answer now due 3/20/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Gem and Jewelry Design, Inc.(Attorney Teresa C Chow added to party L.A. Gem and Jewelry Design, Inc(pty:pla))(Chow, Teresa) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Declaration
Thu 04/06 10:52 AM
DECLARATION of Milord A. Keshishian LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Plaintiff L.A. Gem and Jewelry Design, Inc. (Keshishian, Milord) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Wed 03/22 10:48 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. Both the Court and counsel bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in Federal Court. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jloz) |
|
11 | 11
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 03/22 10:40 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by chambers of Judge John F. Walter. If not yet provided, courtesy copies of all case opening documents shall be delivered to chambers by 12:00 p.m. on March 23, 2017. Failure to comply may result in an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal and/or Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 8:23 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants CBI Distributing Corp., Claires Accessories UK Ltd, Claires Boutiques, Inc, Claires Stores, Inc. (et) |
|
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 8:20 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 8:20 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (et) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 03/20 4:34 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Milord A Keshishian counsel for Plaintiff LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.. Adding J. Nicolas Anwandter as counsel of record for L.A Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff L.A. Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.. (Keshishian, Milord) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/20 4:27 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc. (Keshishian, Milord) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 4:27 PM
CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc., identifying L.A. GEM & JEWELRY DESIGN, INC., CLAIRES BOUTIQUES, INC., d/b/a CLAIRES ACCESSORIES, d/b/a CLAIRES, CLAIRES STORES, INC., CBI DISTRIBUTING CORP., and CLAIRES ACCESSORIES UK LTD. (Keshishian, Milord) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 4:24 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.. (Keshishian, Milord) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Mon 03/20 4:23 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.. (Keshishian, Milord) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 4:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.. (Keshishian, Milord) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19544276 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.. (Attorney Milord A Keshishian added to party LA Gem & Jewelry Design, Inc.(pty:pla))(Keshishian, Milord) |