Tyto Hernandez v. USAA Savings Bank
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02170 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227 Violation of Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Mar 22, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 3:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
USAA Savings Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyto Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Dismissing Case
Thu 08/09 10:24 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled
Tue 08/07 1:19 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Peter Rosen: and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Rosen, Peter) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Settlement
Tue 08/07 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez. (Rosenthal, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Thu 07/05 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Peter Rosen has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice Supplement
Thu 06/21 5:13 PM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting28 31 Non-Resident Attorney David M. Krueger APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USAA Savings Bank, designating Maureen M. Michail as local counsel. (lt) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Supplement
Wed 06/20 2:31 PM
Supplemental APPLICATION to Supplement Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Krueger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USAA Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 5/17/2017, Receipt No. 262GS9BF)28 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form,29 , Text Only Scheduling Notice, 30 filed by defendant USAA Savings Bank. (Michail, Maureen) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 06/14 12:32 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. In response to the Deficiency29 as to the Application Pro Hac Vice28 , the attorney has until 6/20/2018 to file a supplement to their pending application. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Wed 06/13 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Krueger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USAA Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 5/17/2017, Receipt No. 262GS9BF)28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 06/12 2:19 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Krueger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USAA Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 5/17/2017, Receipt No. 262GS9BF) filed by defendant USAA Savings Bank. (Michail, Maureen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice | ||
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Protective Order
Tue 06/05 4:24 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick re REQUEST for Protective Order for Discovery of Confidential Information26 . (sp) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Protective Order
Fri 06/01 4:04 PM
REQUEST for Protective Order for Discovery of Confidential Information filed by defendant USAA Savings Bank. (Michail, Maureen) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 04/06 1:32 PM
ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) |
|
24 | 24
18
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 04/06 1:31 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 12/18/2018 at 8:45 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 04/05 9:23 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3, filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez.. (Rosenthal, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Case Reopened
Thu 03/22 12:07 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Case reopened; MD JS-5.) (vdr) |
|
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Wed 03/21 10:10 AM
STATUS REPORT and Stipulation to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez. (Rosenthal, Matthew) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 05/23 8:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Stay Proceedings17 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendant shall confer with Plaintiff and file a status report advising the Court of the outcome of the decision from the United States Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit in ACA Intl within 14 days from the date of the decision. The status report shall include the parties' position as to how this Court should proceed. All dates on the Court's calendar are hereby vacated and will be reset as necessary. The Clerk shall administratively close the case until further order of the court. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 05/19 3:15 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. No later than 5/25/2017, defendant shall file a supplemental pro hac vice application with an updated certificate of good standing. Please see the court's Notice of Deficiency18 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Thu 05/18 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Krueger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USAA Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19867488)16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt) |
|
17 | 17
stip
Stay Case
Thu 05/18 8:27 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending a decision from the United States Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit in ACA Int'l v. FCC, No. 15-1211 (D.C. Cir.) filed by Defendant USAA Savings Bank.(Michail, Maureen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 05/17 12:01 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Krueger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USAA Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19867488) filed by Defendant USAA Savings Bank. (Michail, Maureen) |
|
Att: 1 Declara tion Declaration of David M. Krueger in Support of Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice Case No. 2:17-CV-02170-FMO(Ex), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 04/19 10:50 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION14 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Scheduling Conference is continued for hearing to 6/8/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Continue
Tue 04/18 1:21 PM
STIPULATION to Continue scheduling conference from May 25, 2017 to June 8, 2017 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only13 filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez.(Rosenthal, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 04/18 11:02 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 04/17 3:29 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant USAA Savings Bank, identifying Plaintiff. (Michail, Maureen) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 04/17 3:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant USAA Savings Bank.(Attorney Maureen M Michail added to party USAA Savings Bank(pty:dft))(Michail, Maureen) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 03/30 2:45 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)
Wed 03/22 8:56 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-02170 FMO(Ex). (rn) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 03/21 3:28 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez, upon Defendant USAA Savings Bank served on 3/21/2017, answer due 4/11/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cailen Johnson, person authorized to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Rosenthal, Matthew) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 9:29 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant USAA Savings Bank. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 8:35 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 8:35 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 4:43 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez. (Rosenthal, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 4:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez. (Rosenthal, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez, (Rosenthal, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19544563 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez. (Attorney Matthew A Rosenthal added to party Tyto Hernandez(pty:pla))(Rosenthal, Matthew) |