Kathryn Frederick v. City of San Bernardino et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00523 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 3:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
Brandon Koch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathryn Frederick
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
City of San Bernardino
Terminated: 04/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 04/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
51 | 51
order
Extension of Time to File
Tue 01/15 2:45 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Denying41 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
50 | 50
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 01/10 10:58 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The Court finds Plantiffs Motion to Extend Time to File Notice of Appeal (Doc. No. 41 ) is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on 1/14/2019. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) |
|
49 | 49
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 01/10 10:50 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Telephonic Appearance48 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: "Motions and Related Filings" - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Requests - Request. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad) |
|
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
48 | 48
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Wed 01/09 4:11 PM
REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE filed by Plaintiff Kathryn Frederick (Odiwe, K) |