Kimberlee Kendrick Goldsmith v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00501 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
judgmentCV
Judgment
Fri 03/16 12:05 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, in favor of Nancy A. Berryhill against Kimberlee Kendrick Goldsmith, Related to: Memorandum & Opinion,24 . IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Commissioner's decision is AFFIRMED. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (sbou) |
|
24 | 24
12
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 03/16 12:01 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING DECISION OF COMMISSIONER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. IT THEREFORE IS ORDERED that Judgment be entered AFFIRMING the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security. (See document for further details.) (sbou) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Mon 10/16 4:00 PM
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Re: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)17 (Snyder, Patrick) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 10/02 1:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: The Order to Show Cause re dismissal for lack of prosecution19 is discharged. (ib) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Mon 09/11 8:19 PM
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Plaintiff Kimberlee Kendrick Goldsmith.(Perales, Monica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Response
Mon 09/11 8:15 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Kimberlee Kendrick Goldsmithto Order to Show Cause,19 (Perales, Monica) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 09/07 8:43 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. IT IS ORDERED that within 20 days of the filing date of this Order, plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed. If plaintiff fails to file a written objection to dismissal of this action within the time specified, it will be deemed to be consent to a dismissal as against Defendant.(See document for further details.) (sbou) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respoth
Administrative Record
Tue 07/18 11:48 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Snyder, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 07/18 11:38 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Snyder, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 06/06 9:36 AM
NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF KIMBERLEE KENDRICK GOLDSMITH filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (mj) (Snyder, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 05/17 3:15 PM
Effective May 24, 2017, Judge MacKinnon will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 840 on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 840 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/21 3:43 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV17-501 AFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Thu 04/20 2:40 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Patrick W Snyder added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Snyder, Patrick) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Mon 04/10 2:51 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Perales, Monica) |
|
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Mon 04/10 2:48 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kimberlee Kendrick Goldsmith, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/7/2017, answer due 8/7/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to O. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to A. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Perales, Monica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Mon 03/27 3:53 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Re Minutes of In Chambers Order9 . (See document for details). (ib) |
|
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 03/27 3:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. (See document for details). (ib) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/27 10:29 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (ib) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/24 4:25 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting3 Plaintiff's REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (ib) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 10:49 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kimberlee Kendrick Goldsmith, (Perales, Monica) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 10:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kimberlee Kendrick Goldsmith. (Perales, Monica) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 10:47 PM
REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Kimberlee Kendrick Goldsmith. (Perales, Monica) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 10:45 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Kimberlee Kendrick Goldsmith. (Perales, Monica) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 10:42 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Kimberlee Kendrick Goldsmith. (Attorney Monica Perales added to party Kimberlee Kendrick Goldsmith(pty:pla))(Perales, Monica) |