(PS) Manco Abbott, Inc. v. Jordan et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence J O'Neill |
Referred: | Sheila K Oberto |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00401 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ashley Adams
|
|
Defendant
Patricia Jordan
8680 N. Glenn #136
Fresno, CA 93711 |
|
Plaintiff
Manco Abbott, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Case Remanded
Wed 03/22 8:35 AM
SUA SPONTE ORDER REMANDING ACTION to Fresno County Superior Court signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/21/2017. CASE CLOSED. Copy of remand order mailed to Fresno County Superior Court . (Jessen, A) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 03/22 8:35 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:5 Order served on Patricia Jordan. (Jessen, A) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Minute Order
Mon 03/20 11:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER: GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, it is ordered that the Clerk of the Court transfer this matter to the Fresno Division of the Eastern District of California. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY)(Vine, H) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of interested parties by Patricia Jordan. (Zignago, K.) | |
2 | 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Patricia Jordan. (Zignago, K.) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL case 17CECL01542 filed by Patricia Jordan. (Zignago, K.) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |