(HC) Cisneros v. Lizarraga
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony W Ishii |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00402 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2018 |
Petitioner
Ramon Cisneros
|
|
Respondent
J. Lizarraga
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 08/03 3:08 PM
ORDER of USCA as to23 Notice of Appeal filed by Ramon Cisneros. Request for Certificate of Appealability is denied. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/06 7:54 AM
ORDER DENYING23 Request for Extension of Time signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/5/2018. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 03/06 7:55 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:27 Order served on Ramon Cisneros. (Sant Agata, S) |
||
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Certificate of Appealability
Thu 03/01 2:56 PM
MOTION for CERTIFICATE of APPEALABILITY and NOTICE of Prior In Forma Pauperis Granted in Eastern District by Ramon Cisneros. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 02/08 11:16 AM
USCA CASE NUMBER 18-15200 for23 Notice of Appeal filed by Ramon Cisneros. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
Appeal Processed to USCA
Wed 02/07 3:47 PM
APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re23 Notice of Appeal filed by Ramon Cisneros. Notice of Appeal filed *2/7/2018*, Complaint filed *3/20/2017* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *1/5/2018*. Court Reporter: *None*. *Fee Status: IFP Granted on 3/20/2017* (Lundstrom, T) |
|
Att: 1 Appeal Information | ||
23 | 23
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 02/07 3:45 PM
NOTICE of APPEAL as to22 Judgment and Request for Extension of Time for filing the COA with the in forma pauperis by Ramon Cisneros. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 02/07 3:47 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:24 Appeal Processed to USCA,23 Notice of Appeal served on Ramon Cisneros. (Lundstrom, T) |
||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment
Fri 01/05 9:35 AM
JUDGMENT dated *1/5/2018* pursuant to order21 . (Jessen, A) |
|
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Fri 01/05 9:35 AM
ORDER ADOPTING17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus; and ORDER DECLINING to Issue a Certificate of Appealability signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/4/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 01/05 9:36 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:22 Judgment,21 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Ramon Cisneros. (Jessen, A) |
||
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respoth
Objections to Findings and Recommendations
Tue 11/21 11:27 AM
OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS17 by Petitioner Ramon Cisneros. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension
Thu 10/26 10:15 AM
ORDER Granting Petitioner's18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Findings and Recommendation, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/26/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 10/26 10:15 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:19 Order on Motion for Extension served on Ramon Cisneros. (Gonzalez, R) |
||
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 10/25 12:29 PM
MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Objections to Findings and17 , by Ramon Cisneros. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Wed 09/20 1:13 PM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/20/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 10/23/2017. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 09/20 1:13 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:17 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Ramon Cisneros. (Sant Agata, S) |
||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Traverse
Thu 07/20 11:30 AM
TRAVERSE to the Respondent's Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ramon Cisneros. (Jessen, A) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension
Tue 06/20 1:54 PM
ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE TRAVERSE14 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/20/2017. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 06/20 1:55 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:15 Order served on Ramon Cisneros. (Lundstrom, T) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 06/19 12:31 PM
MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to file Traverse by Ramon Cisneros. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Acknowledgement of Receipt
Tue 05/16 2:48 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of State Court Records12 , dated 05/15/17 from Attorney General's Office. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Filing / Lodging Document in Paper
Mon 05/15 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by J. Lizarraga: State Court Record. (Smith, Peter) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 05/15 3:24 PM
ANSWER to PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by J. Lizarraga.(Smith, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Courtesy copy of Opinion | ||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction
Fri 04/14 2:28 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE (Text Only Entry): This case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is 1:17-cv-00402-AWI-SAB-(HC). (Lundstrom, T) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 04/14 2:28 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Clerk's Notice served on Ramon Cisneros. (Lundstrom, T) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/13 9:31 AM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by J. Lizarraga. Attorney Smith, Peter H. added. (Smith, Peter) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/03 12:29 PM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ramon Cisneros. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Document(s) Served Electronically
Wed 03/22 9:25 AM
DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Michael Farrell, Attorney General's Office. (Jessen, A) |
|
6 | 6
order
09 - Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment
Wed 03/22 9:24 AM
ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/22/2017. Respondent's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days . (Jessen, A) |
|
5 | 5
order
06 - HC/Order Requiring Respondent to File a Response
Wed 03/22 9:23 AM
ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/21/2017. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (Jessen, A) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 03/22 9:25 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:5 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Ramon Cisneros. (Jessen, A) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
05 - HC/Order Authorizing IFP Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 2:23 PM
ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Ramon Cisneros re2 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/20/2017. (Jessen, A) |
|
3 | 3
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Mon 03/20 2:22 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Petitioner's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days . (Jessen, A) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 2:22 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ramon Cisneros. (Jessen, A) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 03/20 2:21 PM
(2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against J. Lizarraga by Ramon Cisneros. (Jessen, A) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 03/20 2:23 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider,4 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Ramon Cisneros. (Jessen, A) |