(PC) Moon v. D'Agostini
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carolyn K Delaney |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00577 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Defendant
John D'Agostini
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven R. Moon
|
Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago |
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 05/02 5:20 PM
MAIL RETURNED as NIC:7 Judgment,6 Order Dismissing Case, sent to Steven R. Moon. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment
Tue 04/18 1:20 PM
JUDGMENT dated *4/18/2017* pursuant to order signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/18/2017. (Yin, K) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order Dismissing Case Order on Motion for Extension Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/18 1:20 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/18/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's2 request to proceed IFP; the complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim; plaintiff's5 motion for an extension of time is DENIED as moot; and the Clerk shall close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 04/18 1:21 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:7 Judgment,6 Order Dismissing Case served on Steven R. Moon. (Yin, K) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 03/28 10:56 AM
MOTION FOR 90-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME by Steven R. Moon. (Michel, G.) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/28 10:56 AM
CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Steven R. Moon. (Michel, G.) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Mon 03/20 11:38 AM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/24/2017 (Benson, A) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent | ||
service
Service by Mail
Mon 03/20 11:39 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Steven R. Moon. (Benson, A) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 11:38 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Steven R. Moon. (Benson, A) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint
Mon 03/20 11:37 AM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against John D'Agostini by Steven R. Moon.(Benson, A) |