14
|
|
14
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 07/05 11:42 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/5/2017 DISMISSING this action pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(2), with prejudice, and without the award of attorneys' fees and costs to any party; ORDERING that the Court retain jurisdiction over the parties, and any others who are subject to the Settlement Agreement entered into between the parties to this action, for the purposes of enforcing, interpreting, or deciding any claim of breach of the Settlement Agreement. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/03 11:51 AM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT ATTORNEYS' FEES OR COSTS AWARDED TO ANY PARTY; [PROPOSED] ORDER by Christine N. Trice. (Passarelli, Christopher)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 06/22 9:49 AM
SECOND STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/21/17. Defendant shall have an additional thirty (30) days in which to respond to the Complaint filed in this matter. The new deadline shall be 7/19/2017. The deadline for the parties to confer shall be continued to 8/18/17. inclusive. The deadline for the parties to prepare and submit the Joint Status Report shall be continued to 8/18/17, inclusive. The deadline for the parties to exchange their Initial Disclosures shall be continued to 9/1/2017, inclusive. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 06/19 10:30 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, and Related Deadlines (Second Stipulation and Order) by Primitives by Kathy, Inc.. (Baxter, Daniel)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 05/16 12:42 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/16/2017 ORDERING that defendant shall have an additional thirty-one days in which to respond to the complaint. The new deadline for Defendant to file and serve its response to plaintiff's complaint is 6/19/2017. The deadline for the parties to confer is CONTINUED to 7/21/2017. The deadline for the parties to submit the Joint Status Report is CONTINUED to 7/21/2017. The deadline for the parties to exchange their Initial Disclosures is CONTINUED to 8/4/2017. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 05/16 10:05 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, and Related Deadlines by Primitives by Kathy, Inc.. (Baxter, Daniel)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
order
Pro Hac Vice Order
Thu 04/06 11:27 AM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/6/2017 ADDING attorney Laura A. Genovese, PHV for Primitives by Kathy, Inc. (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
misc
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Wed 04/05 2:50 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Primitives by Kathy, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-6999575)(Baxter, Daniel)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Certificate of Good Standing
|
6
|
|
6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/05 2:45 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel Lawrence Baxter on behalf of Primitives by Kathy, Inc.. Attorney Baxter, Daniel Lawrence added. (Baxter, Daniel)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
misc
Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/29 10:45 AM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Christine N. Trice. (Passarelli, Christopher)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 03/29 10:38 AM
WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Primitives by Kathy, Inc. Waiver sent on 3/21/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Passarelli, Christopher)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Trademark New Case Documents for TLN
Mon 03/20 8:45 AM
TRADEMARK NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Trademark #1:* 4,095,211 * * 11/1/2008 * * Christine N. Trice * ; (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Consent Form,
|
| |
Att: 2
Trademark Report,
|
| |
Att: 3
VDRP
|
2
|
|
2
service
Summons
Mon 03/20 8:43 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Primitives by Kathy, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christopher J Passarelli* *1455 First St., Ste. 301* *P.O. Box 3140* *Napa, CA 94559*. (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT against Primitives by Kathy, Inc. by Christine N Trice. Attorney Passarelli, Christopher J added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6969070)(Passarelli, Christopher) Modified on 3/20/2017 (Washington, S).
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|