|
GPO
Mar 21 2017
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/20/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Service of process is appropriate for the Commissioner of Social Security. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the United States Marshal and shall file a statement with the court that such documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)
|
|
GPO
Aug 07 2017
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/7/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment brief is EXTENDED to 9/6/2017. (Washington, S)
|
|
GPO
Sep 06 2017
STIPULATION and ORDER extending time for Plaintiff to file Opening Brief signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/6/17. (Kaminski, H)
|
|
GPO
Nov 27 2017
STIPULATION and ORDER extending the time to December 18, 2017, for Plaintiff to file his Reply Brief signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/27/17: (Kaminski, H)
|
|
GPO
Sep 26 2018
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/26/18 DENYING the Plaintiff's 17 motion for summary judgment; GRANTING the Commissioner's 18 cross-motion for summary judgment); AFFIRMING the final decision of the Commissioner, and ENTERING judgment for the Commissioner; the Clerk shall close this case. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
|