Wilkinson et al v. Compass Bank
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael M Anello |
Referred: | Bernard G Skomal |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00544 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:1691 Equal Credit Opportunity Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:29 AM PDT |
Defendant
Compass Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Wilkinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tim Wilkinson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 01/23 9:47 AM
ORDER Re:23 Joint Motion for an Order to Dismiss Case with Prejudice. This case is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/23/2018. (rmc) (sjt) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss
Mon 01/22 3:10 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Jessica Wilkinson. (Lenz, George)Attorney George Ehrich Lenz added to party Jessica Wilkinson(pty:pla) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Settlement Disposition Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 01/08 1:42 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Settlement Disposition Conference held on 1/5/2018. Settlement issue was resolved. Further Telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference set for 2/9/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. If Joint Motion to Dismiss is filed by 2/5/2018, Settlement Disposition Conference will be vacated.(Plaintiff Attorney Joel L Incorvaia). (Defendant Attorney Parisa Jassim, Preston Ascherin). (no document attached) (rxa) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 11/14 3:55 PM
ORDER: (1) Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference (2) Denying as Moot18 Renewed Joint Motion and Stipulation to Continue Discovery Completion Deadline and All Related Dates. A Joint Motion for Dismissal must be electronically file on or before 12/29/2017. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and proposed order for dismissal are not submitted on or before 12/29/2017, then a Settlement Disposition Conference will be held on 1/5/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. The conference shall be telephonic, with attorneys only. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and proposed order for dismissal are received on or before 12/29/2017, the Settlement Disposition Conference will be vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/14/2017. (ag) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 11/13 5:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Settlement Conference held on 11/13/2017. Judge Skomal settled the case. Settlement Disposition Conference Order to follow.(Plaintiff Attorney Ehrich Lenz). (Defendant Attorneys Parisa Jassim, Preston Ascherin). (no document attached) (rxa) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 11/09 5:47 PM
NOTICE re16 Order Scheduling Settlement Conference After independently speaking with counsel for the parties, the Court CONVERTS the in-person Settlement Conference to a Telephonic Settlement Conference. Plaintiffs Tim and Jessica Wilkinson and the client representative for Compass Bank must still participate in the Telephonic Settlement Conference. Defendant's counsel with the client representative shall call Chambers at 1:30 p.m. on November 13, 2017. Plaintiffs' counsel and Plaintiffs shall call Chambers at 2:00 p.m. on November 13, 2017. All participants should be prepared to be available until the end of the day. (no document attached) (rxa) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Continue
Mon 11/06 2:15 PM
MOTION to Continue and stipulation to continue discovery completion deadline and all related subsequent dates by Compass Bank.(Jassim, Parisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of G. Ehrich Lenz, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Parisa Jassim | ||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Discovery Conference
Thu 11/02 10:45 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held with Chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Counsel for the parties jointly contacted Chambers requesting to toll the 30-day time to raise a discovery dispute regarding Plaintiff's RFPs 3-5, 7-9, 11, 13, 21-24, 27-28, and special interrogatory 4. Defendant is in the process of searching for additional responsive documents for supplemental productions to resolve the dispute. The Court tolls the 30-day deadline to November 13, 2017, the date of the parties' Settlement Conference. If the case does not settle and the dispute has not been resolved, counsel should be prepared to update the Court at the conclusion of the conference on all steps taken to diligently resolve the dispute.(Plaintiff Attorney Ehrich Lenz). (Defendant Attorney Parisa Jassim). (no document attached) (rxa) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 10/31 3:40 PM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. The Court sets a Settlement Conference for 11/13/2017 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/31/2017.(ag) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 10/25 1:46 PM
ORDER Denying14 Joint Motion to Continue Discovery Completion Deadline 90 Days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/25/2017. (ag) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Continue
Mon 10/23 3:22 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Discovery Completion Deadline by Compass Bank. (Jassim, Parisa) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Discovery Conference
Fri 10/20 10:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held with chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Counsel for the parties jointly contacted chambers on October 18, 2017 to toll the 30-day time to raise a discovery dispute. However, based on counsels' representations, the 30-day period is not up until November 2, 2017. The Court will not toll the dispute at this time, but counsel may jointly contact the Court closer to November 2nd if they are unable to resolve the dispute despite diligently seeking to resolve it in the interim. (Plaintiff Attorney Ehrich Lenz). (Defendant Attorney Parisa Jassim). (no document attached) (rxa) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 10/06 4:36 PM
NOTICE: The deadline to submit the parties joint settlement statement is extended to October 13, 2017. The joint settlement statement should be emailed to efile_skomal@casd.uscourts.gov no later than October 13, 2017. (no document attached) (rxa) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 09/14 12:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held with chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Counsel for both parties jointly contacted chambers regarding the scheduling of an additional settlement conference. Parties shall lodge a joint settlement statement with chambers at efile_skomal@casd.uscourts.gov no later than October 6, 2017. (Plaintiff Attorney Ehrich Lenz). (Defendant Attorney Parisa Jassim, Preston Ascherin). (no document attached) (rxa) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/01 2:05 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: A Case Management Conference was held on 7/31/2017. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 7/11/2018 at 1:30 PM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. The parties must file their Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by 7/23/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/20/2018 at 2:30 PM before Judge Michael M. Anello. The Proposed Final Pretrial Order is due by 9/7/2018. Trial is set for 9/18/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge Michael M. Anello. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/1/2017.(ag) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
Case Management Conference Status Conference
Mon 07/31 5:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on July 31, 2017: Court held a Telephonic Status Conference. The parties are not in a position to settle the case, but shall jointly contact the Court when they are in a position to discuss settlement. Case Management Conference held. Court to issue Scheduling Order. Additional ENE and CMC set for August 7, 2017 are VACATED. (Plaintiff Attorney Joel L Incorvaia). (Defendant Attorney Parisa Jassim, Preston Ascherin). (no document attached) (rxa) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 06/30 4:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on June 30, 2017. The Court continues the ENE and Case Management Conference to August 7, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. The parties are authorized to conduct the informal discovery discussed during the ENE in advance of the continued ENE. (Plaintiff Attorney Joel L Incorvaia). (Defendant Attorney Parisa Jassim). (no document attached) (rxa) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 06/12 5:35 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lenz, George) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 05/26 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Parisa Jassim (Jassim, Parisa) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Wed 05/03 11:57 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 6/30/2017 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, a Case Management Conference, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) will be held at the conclusion of the settlement conference. A Joint Discovery Plan is due on or before 6/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/3/2017.(ag) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/25 4:01 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Compass Bank.(Jassim, Parisa)Attorney Parisa Jassim added to party Compass Bank (pty:dft) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/12 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tim Wilkinson. Compass Bank served. (Incorvaia, Joel) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 10:47 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dsn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 10:44 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Compass Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9911079.), filed by Tim Wilkinson, Jessica Wilkinson. The new case number is 3:17-cv-544-MMA-BGS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Incorvaia, Joel)(dsn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |