Broom v. Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Barry Ted Moskowitz |
Referred: | Barbara Lynn Major |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00548 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Broom
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach
Terminated: 05/16/2017
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Party
Tue 10/10 4:26 PM
ORDER Granting15 Joint Motion for Dismissal, with Prejudice, as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Each party to bear its own fees and costs. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement of this action. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/10/2017. (mxn) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss Party
Fri 09/29 12:19 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Experian Information Solutions, Inc., with Prejudice by Timothy Broom. (Ovruchesky, Clark) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Tue 08/15 4:37 PM
ORDER Confirming Settlement and Setting Deadline to File Joint Motion for Dismissal. Parties are ordered to file their joint motion for dismissal of this case no later than 10/17/2017. If the fully executed joint motion for dismissal is not filed, then all counsel of record and unrepresented parties for Plaintiff and Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. are required to appear in person for a Settlement Disposition Conference. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 10/24/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/15/2017.(mxn) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 08/14 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Timothy Broom (Ovruchesky, Clark) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 06/29 2:21 PM
ORDER Granting11 Joint Motion for Protective Order with Modification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/29/2017. (rlu) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Protective Order
Mon 06/26 3:05 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Martin, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Joint Protective Order | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/31 1:52 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 2/12/2018 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 6/12/2018, if needed. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/3/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2018 at 3:30 PM before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/31/2017.(rlu) |
|
9 | 9
minutes
Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Case Management Conference
Wed 05/31 10:27 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 5/31/2017. Case did not settle. Case Management Conference held on 5/31/2017. Order to follow.(Plaintiff Attorney Clark Ovruchesky). (Defendant Attorney Gregory S. Martin). (no document attached) (bll) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/24 6:08 PM
NOTICE of Statement Regarding Plaintiff's Availability for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by Timothy Broom re5 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference, (Ovruchesky, Clark) |
|
Saturday, May 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Joint Discovery Plan
Sat 05/20 8:30 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Timothy Broom (Ovruchesky, Clark) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 05/16 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Timothy Broom as to Defendant Farmers and Merchants Bank of Long Beach Only, with Prejudice (Ovruchesky, Clark) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Tue 04/18 10:10 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Joint Discovery Plan due 5/19/2017. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/31/2017 at 9:30 AM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. In the event the case does not settle during the ENE, the Court will conduct an Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/18/2017.(rlu) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Mon 04/17 5:46 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Martin, Gregory) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/17 5:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Martin, Gregory)Attorney Gregory S. Martin added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 1:41 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dsn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9912211.), filed by Timothy Broom. The new case number is 3:17-cv-548-BTM-BLM. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Ovruchesky, Clark)(dsn) (sjt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |