Doe v. Ejercito de Liberacion Naciona
Original Case: 1:15-cv-08652
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-00759 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 11, 2018 4:25 AM EDT |
Amicus Curiae
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Def-Third-Party-Plaintiff-Counter-Claimant -
JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Def-Third-Party-Plaintiff-Counter-Claimant -
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ejercito de Liberacion National, AKA ELN
|
|
Defendant
National Liberation Army and Fuerza Armadas Revolucionarios de Colombia, AKA FARC
|
|
Defendant
Standard Chartered Bank
|
|
Defendant
Banco de Fomento Angola, SARL
|
|
Defendant
Banco Africano Investimentos, SARL
|
|
Defendant
Grupo Arosfran Empreendimentos E Participacoes, SARL
|
|
Defendant
Golfrate Holdings (Angola) LDA
|
|
Defendant
Ejercito de Liberacion Nacional, AKA ELN
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Deutsche Bank Trust Company, of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Commerzbank AG, New York Branch
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
John Doe
|
Represented By
|
Third-Party-Defendant
American Life Insurance Company, incorrectly pleaded as "Metropolitan Life Insurance Company"
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Alico Life Insurance Company, Lebanon Branch, improperly pleaded as "Metropolitan Life Insurance Company"
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Donald J. Havlish, Jr.
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Michael A. Bane
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Martin Boryczewski
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Steven Cafiero
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Richard M. Caproni
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Peter Chirchirllo
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Jeffrey Coale
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Daniel M. Coffey
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Jason Coffey
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Jeffrey Collman
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Michael Diehl
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Stephen Dorf
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Judy Fernandez
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Ronald Gamboa
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of William R. Godshalk
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of John Grazioso
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Liming Gu
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of James D. Halvorson
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Dennis Lavelle
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Robert Levine
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Joseph Lostrangio
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Dorothy Mauro
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Mary Melendez
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Peter T. Milano
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Yvette Nichole Moreno
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Brian Nunez
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Philip Paul Ognibene
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Salvatore T. Papasso
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of John William Perry
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Marsha Dianah Ratchford
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Joshua Scott Reiss
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of John M. Rodak
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Elvin Romero
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Richard Rosenthal
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Maria Theresa Santillian
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Victor Saracini
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Scott Schertzer
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Paul K. Sloan
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of George Eric Smith
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Timothy P. Soulas
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of William R. Steiner
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Andrew Stergiopoulos
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Edward W. Straub
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Jennifer Tino
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Jennmarie Wallendorf
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Meta Waller
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Timothy Raymond Ward
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Fiona Havlish
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Donald G. Havlish, Sr.
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Susan Conklin
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Tara Bane
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Donald Bane
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Christina Bane-Haynes
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Krystyna Boryczewski
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Michael Boryczewski
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Julia Boryczewski
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Michele Boryczewski
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Richard A. Caproni
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Dolores Caproni
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Christopher Caproni
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Michael Caproni
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Lisa Caproni-Brown
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Clara Chirchirillo
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Livia Chirchirillo
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Catherine Deblieck
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
William Coale
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Frances M. Coffey
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Daniel D. Coffey
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Kevin M. Coffey
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Dwayne W. Collman
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Brian Collman
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Brenda Sorenson
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Loisanne Diehl
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Morris Dorf
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Anne Marie Dorf
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Joseph Dorf
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Michelle Dorf
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Robert Dorf
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Linda Sammut
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Corazon Fernandez
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Grace M. Parkinson-Godshalk
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Tina Grazioso
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Maureen R. Halvorson
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Jin Liu
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Alan Gu
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Grace Kneski
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Roni Levine
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Teresanne Lostrangio
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Joanne Lovett
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Regina Maria Merwin
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Margaret Mauro
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Ramon Melendez
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Patricia Milano
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Ivy Moreno
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Vincent A. Ognibene
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Marie Ann Paprocki
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Patricia J. Perry
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Christine Papasso
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Rodney Ratchford
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Rodney M. Ratchford
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Marshee R. Ratchford
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Benefit of Maranda
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Joyce Ann Rodak
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Chelsea Nicole Rodak
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Benefit of Devon Marie Rodak
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
John Rodak
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Regina Rodak
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Joanne Rodak Gori
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Diane Romero
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Loren Rosenthal
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Judith Reiss
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Expedito Santillian
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Ester Santillian
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Ellen L. Saracini
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Guardian of Anne C. Saracini
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Joanne M. Renzi
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Paul Schertzer
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Ronald S. Sloan
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Raymond Doyle Smith
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Katherine Soulas
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Russa Steiner
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
George Stergiopoulos
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Angela Stergiopoulos
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Sandra Straub
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Joan E. Tino
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Pamela Schiele
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Christine Barton, now Pence
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Doyle Raymond Ward
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Gerald W. Bingham
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Alice Carpeneto
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Stephen L. Cartledge
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Michelle Wright
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Haomin Jian
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Fu Mei Chien Huang
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Huichun Jian
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Hui-Chuan Jian
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Hui-Chien Chen
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Hui-Zon Jian
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Michael Loguidice
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Ralph S. Maerz
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Martin Panik
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Linda Ellen Panik
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Mary Lynn-Anna Panik Stanley
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Helen Rosenthal
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Alexander Rowe
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Ed Russin
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Gloria Russin
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Barry Russin
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Leonard Zeplin
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Leona Zeplin
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Keith Stansell
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Marc Gonsalves
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Thomas Howes
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Judith G. Janis
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Christopher T. Janis
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Greer C. Janis
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Michael J. Janis
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Jonathan N. Janis
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Antonio Caballero
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Grand Stores Ltd.
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Trust Bank Ltd.
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Tajco, AKA Tajco Ltd.
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Arab Gambian Islamic Bank Ltd.
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
AHLI United Bank, UK PLC
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Kassim Tajideen
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Charles Collman
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Credit Suisse AG
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Estate of Jeanmarie Wallendorf
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Benefit of Maranda C. Ratchford
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Devon Marie Rodak
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
M.D. George Stergiopoulos
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Christine Barton-Pence, now Pence
|
|
Third-Party-Defendant
William Havlish
|
GPO
Aug 09 2018
OPINION, affirming the judgment of the district court, by BDP, RCW, DC dissenting, FILED.[2363606] [17-759] |
Docket last updated: 08/11/2018 4:24 AM EDT |