LPP Mortgage Ltd., LP v. David Gates
Original Case: 2:15-cv-10008
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-55355 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 31, 2018 1:37 AM PDT |
Defendant-counter-claimant - Appellant
DAVID W. GATES, Trustee of the David W. Gates Trust dated August 5, 1996
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-counter-defendant - Appellee
LPP MORTGAGE LTD., LP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/31/2018 1:34 AM PDT |
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 17-55355 Due] ). [10361959] (JMR) [Entered: 03/17/2017 03:44 PM] | |
2 | 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/24/2017. Transcript ordered by 04/17/2017. Transcript due 07/17/2017. Appellant David W. Gates opening brief due 08/24/2017. Appellee LPP Mortgage Ltd., LP answering brief due 09/25/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10361962] (JMR) [Entered: 03/17/2017 03:45 PM] |