Vance et al v. Transworld Systems, Inc. et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David A Ezra |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00225 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:24 AM CDT |
Defendant
Transworld Systems, Inc.
registered agent 1999 Bryan St., Ste. 900
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Turnstile Capital Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
US Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Redding
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brittany Vance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Thomason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marsha McCleskey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
61 | 61
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 09/10 4:40 PM
ORDER re60 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Turnstile Capital Management, LLC, US Bank, N.A., Transworld Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
60 | 60
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 09/07 11:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Transworld Systems, Inc., Turnstile Capital Management, LLC, US Bank, N.A..(White, Whitney) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order of dismissal with prejudice |