LEVINSON et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Kelly |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00511 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1602 Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 01, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 5:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
|
|
Plaintiff
SUSAN LEVINSON BOOTHE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE LEVINSON CURRY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE LEVINSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL LEVINSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID LEVINSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DOUGLAS LEVINSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT LEVINSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SAMANTHA LEVINSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SARAH LEVINSON MORIARTY
|
Represented By
|
1. | Family of missing former FBI agent files lawsuit against the Islamic Republic (abcnews.go.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/27/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, July 15, 2022 | ||
97 | 97
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Fri 07/15 11:41 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/15/2022. (lctjk3) |
|
notice
Notice of QC
Fri 07/15 12:52 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re96 Motion for Protective Order; emailed to dlm@beggslane.com, cc'd 12 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document , 2. The proposed document that you are filing should be attached to an actual Motion. (ztth, ) |
||
Thursday, July 14, 2022 | ||
96 | 96
motion
Protective Order
Thu 07/14 10:17 AM
MOTION for Protective Order by SUSAN LEVINSON BOOTHE, STEPHANIE LEVINSON CURRY, CHRISTINE LEVINSON, DANIEL LEVINSON, DAVID LEVINSON, DOUGLAS LEVINSON, ROBERT LEVINSON, SAMANTHA LEVINSON, SARAH LEVINSON MORIARTY. (McGee, David) |