HALL v. LOGAN et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | W Louis Sands |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00062 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
CITY OF PELHAM
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OFFICER DENNIS LOGAN
|
|
Defendant
NEALIE MCCORMICK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MELESSA HALL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Judgment
Mon 11/05 4:46 PM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. (mdm) |
|
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/05 3:40 PM
ORDER re24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by MELESSA HALL. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/05/2018. (mdm) |
|
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 11/02 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MELESSA HALL (SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/23 9:23 AM
ORDER staying all pending deadlines until October 30, 2018. On that date, the parties are ordered to either file the necessary settlement documents or file a motion for additional time with the Court which must include a written statement as to why additional time is needed. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/23/2018. (bcl) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 07/19 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by CITY OF PELHAM(Coleman, Franklin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order To administratively close case | ||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/29 10:32 AM
ORDER directing the Parties to file the necessary dismissal documents within 20 days after the entry of this order re20 Notice of Settlement filed by MELESSA HALL. All pending deadlines are hereby stayed until further notice of the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 6/29/2018. (bcl) |
|
utility
Case Stayed
Fri 06/29 10:33 AM
Case Stayed (bcl) |
||
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 06/28 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by MELESSA HALL (SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 05/07 2:14 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Stay Discovery pending mediation. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 5/7/2018 (bcl) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stay
Tue 05/01 11:15 AM
JOINT MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Mediation by MELESSA HALL filed by ALFREDA LYNETTE SHEPPARD.(SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 05/01 9:58 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Document must be refiled using correct event - Motion to Stay. (bcl) |
||
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Mon 04/30 4:38 PM
STIPULATION to Temporary Stay of Discovery by MELESSA HALL (SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 01/19 3:56 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Discovery to be complete by 5/7/2018. Dispositive motions due by 6/6/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/19/2018 (bcl) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 01/18 3:58 PM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by MELESSA HALL filed by ALFREDA LYNETTE SHEPPARD.(SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Fri 09/01 11:57 AM
Letter regarding ADR (SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling/Discovery Order
Tue 08/29 1:41 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER :Discovery to be complete by 2/5/2018. Jury Trial tentativley set for 10/1/2018 08:30 AM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Dispositive motions due by 3/5/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 8/29/2017.(bcl) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 08/08 4:24 PM
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS: Scheduling Conference held on 8/8/2017. Scheduling and Discovery Order to be entered.Court Reporter: Sally Gray. (jbk) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order - Rules 16/26
Fri 06/23 10:21 AM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/1/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2017 03:30 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS. Corporate Disclosures due by 7/7/2017. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 6/23/17. (jbk) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 05/23 9:30 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; For future reference, all documents must be filed in text-searchable PDF. Do not refile. (bcl) |
||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 05/22 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by HAYDEN HEADLEY HOOKS on behalf of CITY OF PELHAM, NEALIE MCCORMICK Attorney HAYDEN HEADLEY HOOKS added to party CITY OF PELHAM(pty:dft), Attorney HAYDEN HEADLEY HOOKS added to party NEALIE MCCORMICK(pty:dft) (HOOKS, HAYDEN) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/10 2:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELESSA HALL as to CITY OF PELHAM. (SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/10 2:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELESSA HALL as to NEALIE MCCORMICK. (SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/10 2:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELESSA HALL as to DENNIS LOGAN. (SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Supplement to Complaint
Thu 04/13 4:17 PM
ANSWER to Supplement to Complaint by CITY OF PELHAM.(Coleman, Franklin)Attorney Franklin T. Coleman, IV added to party CITY OF PELHAM(pty:dft) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Supplement to Complaint
Wed 03/29 9:20 AM
Supplement re1 Complaint, against All Defendants by MELESSA HALL (SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent
Tue 03/21 1:26 PM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to MELESSA HALL (bcl) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 1:26 PM
Summons Issued as to CITY OF PELHAM. (bcl) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 1:23 PM
Summons Issued as to NEALIE MCCORMICK. (bcl) Modified on 3/21/2017 (bcl) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 1:22 PM
Summons Issued as to DENNIS LOGAN. (bcl) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Complaint
Tue 03/21 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2570121, $400 filed by MELESSA HALL(SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Dennis Logan, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Nealie McCormick, | ||
Att: 4 Summons City of Pelham |