Morgan v. Leeow et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon E Deguilio |
Referred: | Michael G Gotsch, Sr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00225 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Transferring Case to Other District
Wed 06/14 2:50 PM
ORDER: The claims against Defendants Doctor Leeow, DeAngela Boyan and Doctor Nance are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case and the remaining claims against Defendant Psychiatrist Dwenger are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 6/14/17. (cer) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Fri 06/09 3:12 PM
Letter from Christopher Morgan to the Court re: Order to Amend. (jld) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 06/05 10:13 AM
ORDER DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Complaint (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Christian B. Morgan; GRANTS him until 6/30/2017, to file one amended complaint in this case; and CAUTIONS him, that if he does not file an amended complaint containing only related claims by that deadline, the court will dismiss the unrelated claims. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/2/2017.(Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) |
|
Att: 1 Prisoner Complaint | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent to Prisoner E-Service
Fri 06/02 9:02 AM
Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Christian B Morgan (Already added with previous consent1 on 3/21/2017) (nae) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Fri 06/02 9:00 AM
Letter in response to court's order7 from Christian Morgan (nae) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 10:03 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon E DeGuilio for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann no longer assigned to case. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 04/20 1:39 PM
ORDER: The court DENIES Christian B. Morgans request for counsel ECF6 , GRANTS Christian B. Morgans request for additional time ECF6 to file an amended complaint, DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Complaint (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Christian B. Morgan, GRANTS Christian B. Morgan until 5/31/17 to file one amended complaint in this case and REMINDS Christian B. Morgan that if he does not respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/20/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with form). (nal) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Wed 04/19 2:44 PM
Letter from Christian B Morgan. (nae) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 03/29 11:48 AM
ORDER granting3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court WAIVES the initial partial filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff, Christian B. Morgan, IDOC # 203268, to pay (and the facility having custody of him to automatically remit) 20% of the money he receives for each calendar month during which he receives $10.00 or more until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full, DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/29/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Westville Correctional). (nal) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 03/29 11:00 AM
ORDER DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Complaint (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Christian B. Morgan; GRANTS him, until 4/27/2017, to file one amended complaint in this case; and CAUTIONS him, that if he does not respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/29/2017.(Copy of Order and Prisoner Complaint sent to pro se party via Westville E-File)(lhc) |
|
Att: 1 Prisoner Complaint | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/21 1:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Christian B Morgan. (nae) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Pro Se Complaint
Tue 03/21 1:41 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms against DeAngela Boyan, Dwenger, Doctor Leeow, Doctor Nance, filed by Christian B Morgan.(nae) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits Volume 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits Volume 2, | ||
Att: 3 Memorandum of Law | ||
1 | 1
misc
Consent to Prisoner E-Service
Tue 03/21 1:34 PM
Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Christian B Morgan (nae) |