Raul v. Sakhai et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02035 |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
William Ahdout
|
|
Defendant
James G. Brown
|
|
Defendant
Robin Davis
|
|
Defendant
Kenneth Grossman
|
|
Defendant
Arthur Gruen
|
|
Defendant
Robert Lande
|
|
Defendant
Eric LeGoff
|
|
Defendant
Dror Niv
|
|
Defendant
Bryan I. Reyhani
|
|
Defendant
David Sakhai
|
|
Defendant
Ryan Silverman
|
|
Defendant
Eduard Yusupov
|
|
Nominal Defendant
Global Brokerage, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Raul
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
order
Judgment ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Case Stay Lifted
Mon 07/10 12:02 PM
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT: The Settlement is approved as fair, reasonable and adequate, and in the best interests of the Class. This Court further finds that the Settlement set forth in the Stipulation is the result of good faith, arm's-length negotiations between experienced counsel representing the interests of Class Representatives, Class Members, and the Individual Defendants. The Parties are directed to consummate the Settlement in accordance with the terms and provisions of the Stipulation. The Action and all claims contained therein, as well as all of the Released Claims, are dismissed with prejudice as against each and all of the Defendants. The Parties are to bear their own costs, except as otherwise provided in the Stipulation. Class Counsel are hereby awarded one third of the Settlement Amount, or $2,166,666.67, in fees, which the Court finds to be fair and reasonable, and $662,469.61 in reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses. The Court hereby awards $20,000 to Lead Plaintiff and Class Representative Shipco Transport Inc. and $15,000 to Class Representative E-Global Trade and Finance Group, Inc., which the Court finds to be fair and reasonable. The Individual Defendants, FXCM, and the Released Parties shall have no responsibility for, and no liability whatsoever with respect to, any payments to Class Counsel, Class Representatives, the Class and/or any other Person who receives payment from the Settlement Fund. Case Stay Lifted. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/7/2023) (ate) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 08/21 11:34 AM
NOTICE of ATTORNEY CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND LAW FIRM. Document filed by Jonathan Raul..(Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
misc
Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Thu 12/14 5:28 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to Global Brokerage, Inc. . Document filed by William Ahdout, James G. Brown, Robin Davis, Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Robert Lande, Eric LeGoff, Dror Niv, Bryan I. Reyhani, David Sakhai, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov(Dahan, Israel) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A - Notice of Bankruptcy Case Filing of Global Brokerage, Inc. | ||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 05/04 12:28 PM
ORDER: granting34 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/3/2017) (ap) |
|
34 | 34
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 05/03 12:16 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference on May 5, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Joshua M. Lifshitz dated May 3, 2017. Document filed by Jonathan Raul.(Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 04/27 4:57 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER STAY OF LITIGATION AND RELATED MATTERS: For the foregoing reasons, the parties respectfully request that the Court stay this litigation and all proceedings and deadlines pending the earlier of (i) the close of discovery in the Related Securities Class Actions, or (ii) the deadline for appealing a dismissal of the Related Securities Class Actions with prejudice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/27/2017) (cf) |
|
utility
Case Stayed
Thu 04/27 4:57 PM
Case Stayed (cf) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 04/18 1:58 PM
ORDER granting31 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Before the Court are five related actions: Khoury v. FXCM Inc. (No. 17-cv-916), Zhao v. FXCM Inc. (No. 17-cv-955), Blinn v. FXCM Inc. (No. 17-cv-1028), Raul v. Sakhai (No. 17-cv-2035), and 683 Capital Partners, LP v. Global Brokerage, Inc. (No. 17-cv-2506). A conference in these actions shall be held on May 5, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1506 of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. At this conference, the Court shall address the pending motions to consolidate the related actions, to appoint lead plaintiff(s), and to appoint lead plaintiffs' counsel. The initial pretrial conferences presently scheduled for April 21, 2017 in Khoury (No. 17-cv-916), Blinn (No. 17-cv-1028), and Raul (No. 17-cv-2035) are hereby adjourned until further notice from the Court. Status Conference set for 5/5/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/18/2017) (cf) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 04/14 12:04 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference April 21, 2017 at 3:45 PM addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Joshua M. Lifshitz dated April 14, 2017. Document filed by Jonathan Raul.(Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 04/11 12:04 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/21/2017 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/11/2017) (ap) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Fri 03/24 6:57 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-00916-RA. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Fri 03/24 6:58 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 03/24 6:58 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. (wb) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:42 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eduard Yusupov. (nm) |
|
28 | 28
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:39 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ryan Silverman. (nm) |
|
27 | 27
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Sakhai. (nm) |
|
26 | 26
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:37 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bryan I. Reyhani. (nm) |
|
25 | 25
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dror Niv. (nm) |
|
24 | 24
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eric LeGoff. (nm) |
|
23 | 23
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Lande. (nm) |
|
22 | 22
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:33 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arthur Gruen. (nm) |
|
21 | 21
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:31 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth Grossman. (nm) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:30 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Global Brokerage, Inc.. (nm) |
|
19 | 19
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:28 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robin Davis. (nm) |
|
18 | 18
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:26 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James G. Brown. (nm) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:25 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Ahdout. (nm) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Wed 03/22 12:12 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:17-cv-00916-RA. Document filed by Jonathan Raul.(Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 03/22 9:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua M. Lifshitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 160 (Stockholders Suits). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 850 (Securities/Commodities). (kl) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 03/22 9:20 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua M. Lifshitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jonathan Raul. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (kl) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 03/22 9:24 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (kl) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 03/22 9:24 AM
Case Designated ECF. (kl) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Wed 03/22 9:25 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Ronnie Abrams as possibly related to 1:17-cv-00916-RA. (kl) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Related Case Statement
Wed 03/22 9:25 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Joshua M. Lifshitz, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (kl) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/21 12:37 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eduard Yusupov, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Raul. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
14 | 14
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/21 12:36 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan Silverman, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Raul. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
13 | 13
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/21 12:36 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Sakhai, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Raul. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
12 | 12
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/21 12:35 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bryan I. Reyhani, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Raul. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
11 | 11
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/21 12:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dror Niv, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Raul. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
10 | 10
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/21 12:33 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eric LeGoff, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Raul. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
9 | 9
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/21 12:33 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Lande, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Raul. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/21 12:32 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arthur Gruen, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Raul. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/21 12:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kenneth Grossman, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Raul. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/21 12:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Global Brokerage, Inc., re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Raul. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/21 12:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robin Davis, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Raul. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/21 12:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James G. Brown, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Raul. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/21 12:28 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William Ahdout, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jonathan Raul. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 03/21 12:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 12:14 PM
COMPLAINT against William Ahdout, James G. Brown, Robin Davis, Global Brokerage, Inc., Kenneth Grossman, Arthur Gruen, Robert Lande, Eric LeGoff, Dror Niv, Bryan I. Reyhani, David Sakhai, Ryan Silverman, Eduard Yusupov. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13445224)Document filed by Jonathan Raul.(Lifshitz, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 6 pgs Complaint Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint Part 3, | ||
Att: 3 Complaint Part 4, | ||
Att: 4 Complaint Part 5, | ||
Att: 5 6 pgs Complaint Part 6, | ||
Att: 6 Complaint Part 7, | ||
Att: 7 Complaint Part 8 |