DOE v. BOYERTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward G Smith |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-01249 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
BOYERTOWN AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DR. BRETT COOPER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DR. E. WAYNE FOLEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DAVID KREM
|
Represented By
|
Movant
PENNSYLVANIA YOUTH CONGRESS FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOEL DOE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACK JONES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MACY ROE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARY SMITH
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
DR. RICHARD FAIDLEY
Terminated: 09/12/2017
|
Represented By
|
Movant
AIDAN DESTEFANO
Terminated: 07/06/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal judge set to hear lawsuit challenging Boyertown Area School District transgender school policy (wfmz.com) |
Submitted Mon 07/17/2017 | |
2. | Student files lawsuit against Boyertown School District over transgender locker room policy (philadelphia.cbslocal.com) |
Submitted Thu 03/23/2017 | |