Rodriguez-Santi v. Dorethy et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Joe Billy Mcdade |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-04086 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 07, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/09 3:01 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 7/9/2018. On September 22, 2017, the Court dismissed Plaintiff's complaint with leave to replead within 30 days. Plaintiff did not replead and, on November 7, 2017, the case was dismissed. More than seven months later, Plaintiff files15 , a motion for status.15 is GRANTED to the extent the Plaintiff is advised this case has been dismissed and closed. The clerk is directed to send a copy of the merit review order and judgment. (SAG, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 06/27 1:13 PM
MOTION for Status by Plaintiff Carlos Rodriguez-Santi. Responses due by 7/11/2018 (SAG, ilcd) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Judgment
Tue 11/07 10:43 AM
JUDGMENT entered in a civil case (SAG, ilcd) |
|
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 11/07 9:21 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 11/7/2017. Plaintiff's complaint was dismissed at merit review, with leave to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days. See Order13 . More than 30 days have passed, and plaintiff has failed to file an amended complaint. This case is dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to file an amended complaint and failure to comply with the Court's orders. This case is closed.(SAG, ilcd) |
||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Request Counsel Prisoner Merit Review Opinion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 09/22 1:20 PM
MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 9/22/2017. IT IS ORDERED: 1) Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the entry of this order to file an amended complaint. Failure to file an amended complaint will result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice, for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff's amended complaint will replace Plaintiff's original complaint in its entirety. Accordingly, the amended complaint must contain all allegations against all Defendants. Piecemeal amendments are not accepted. 2) Plaintiff's5 motion for counsel is MOOT, with leave to reassert if he files an amended complaint. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
misc
Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Wed 06/21 1:01 PM
Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 6/21/2017, in the amount of $.07; receipt number 14626029637 (JRK, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Thu 04/13 12:29 PM
Letter from (non-party) Michael Baker (SL, ilcd) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Thu 04/13 12:29 PM
Letter from (non-party) Michael Baker (SL, ilcd) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Thu 04/13 12:27 PM
Letter from (non-party) Michael Baker (SL, ilcd) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger
Mon 04/03 12:34 PM
+++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Carlos Rodriguez-Santi (SL, ilcd) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Mon 04/03 12:33 PM
Letter from Plaintiff Carlos Rodriguez-Santi (SL, ilcd) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger
Thu 03/23 11:50 AM
+++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Carlos Rodriguez-Santi (SL, ilcd) |
|
order
Order on Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/23 12:24 PM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.97. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 3/23/2017. (SL, ilcd) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Tue 03/21 8:47 AM
Trust Fund Letter to Hill Correctional Center requesting Trust Fund Ledgers from 9/20/16 through 3/20/17 as to Carlos Rodriguez-Santi. (FDT, ilcd) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Request Counsel
Tue 03/21 8:25 AM
MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Carlos Rodriguez-Santi. Responses due by 4/3/2017 (FDT, ilcd) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger
Tue 03/21 8:24 AM
+++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Carlos Rodriguez-Santi (FDT, ilcd) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/21 8:23 AM
PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Carlos Rodriguez-Santi.(FDT, ilcd) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Opening
Tue 03/21 8:22 AM
NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602.Merit Review Deadline set for 4/10/2017.(FDT, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 8:21 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Carlos Rodriguez-Santi.(FDT, ilcd) |