John Doe KC v. United States of America et al Reminder to Counsel: Case Consolidated for Discovery; All Non-Dispositive filings to be made in Lead Case #17-2081 ONLY
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos Murguia |
Referred: | Teresa J James |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02167 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1346 Tort Claim |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:03 AM CDT |
Defendant
Mark E. Wisner
641 East 8th Street
Horton, KS 66439 |
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe KC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 01/31 7:16 PM
ORDER granting31 MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. This case is closed. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 1/31/2020. Mailed to pro se party Mark E. Wisner by regular mail. (jsh) |
|
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Dismiss
Wed 01/08 1:27 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Plaintiff John Doe KC (Curry, Daniel) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 12/22 9:38 AM
ANSWER to22 Amended Complaint by United States of America.(Haston, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 12/13 4:19 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part24 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The motion is granted as to Count IV, and some of plaintiff's claims may be time-barred. The motion is denied in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 12/13/17. Mailed to pro se party Mark Wisner by regular mail. (kao) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Entry of Appearance
Fri 12/01 4:05 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Chris Benson on behalf of United States of America (Benson, Chris) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 11/27 1:57 PM
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant United States of America re:24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Elliott, Virginia) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/13 5:32 PM
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff John Doe KC re24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Curry, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
29
pgs
support
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 11/09 11:39 AM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant United States of America.(Elliott, Virginia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Redacted, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
24 | 24
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 11/09 11:37 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant United States of America. (Elliott, Virginia) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 10/02 10:27 AM
ORDER denying as moot15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/2/17. Mailed to pro se party Mark E. Wisner by regular mail. (kao) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 09/26 3:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Doe KC.(Curry, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Amend Complaint
Wed 09/20 8:01 AM
ORDER granting20 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend. Plaintiff is ordered to electronically file his Second Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Pursuant to an agreement between the parties, Defendant United States of America is granted an extension of time, up to and including forty-five (45) days after Plaintiff files his Second Amended Complaint, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/20/2017. Mailed to pro se party Mark E. Wisner by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Amend Complaint
Tue 09/19 4:42 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint re13 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff John Doe KC (Curry, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint | ||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 08/11 3:52 PM
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant The United States of America re:15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Haston, Sarah) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 07/28 4:24 PM
RESPONSE by Plaintiff John Doe KC re15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Curry, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 07/20 3:01 PM
ORDER denying as moot6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 7/20/17. (kao) |
|
16 | 16
support
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 07/20 2:25 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant The United States of America(Elliott, Virginia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit - Redacted A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 07/20 2:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant The United States of America (Elliott, Virginia) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Consolidating Case
Tue 06/13 11:21 AM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2), Case Nos. 17-cv-2081-CM-TJJ, 17-cv-2088-CM-TJJ, 17-cv-2089-CM-TJJ, 17-cv-2094-CM-TJJ, 17-cv-2098-CM-TJJ, 17-cv-2102-CM-TJJ, 17-cv-2108-CM-TJJ, 17-cv-2114-CM-TJJ, 17-cv-2119-CM-TJJ, 17-cv-2148-CM-TJJ, 17-cv-2167-CM-TJJ, 17-cv-2169-CM-TJJ, 17-cv-2170-CM-TJJ,17-cv-2182-CM-TJJ, and 17-cv-2187-CM-TJJ are hereby consolidated for discovery purposes only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the lowest-numbered case, No. 17-cv-2081-CMTJJ, shall be designated as the lead case. The remaining cases shall be member cases. Until further order, all future filings in the consolidated action which are non-dispositive in nature shall be made only in the lead case, No. 17-cv-2081-CM-TJJ; however, all such non-dispositive future filings shall be captioned as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 06/13/2017. (cv) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 06/06 2:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (CORRECTED) against All Defendants, filed by John Doe KC.(Curry, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 06/05 5:06 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Doe KC.(Curry, Daniel) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint
Mon 06/05 4:26 PM
ORDER granting8 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend. Plaintiff is ordered to electronically file his Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Pursuant to an agreement between the parties, Defendant United States of America is granted an extension of time, up to and including forty-five (45) days after Plaintiff files his Amended Complaint, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/5/2017. Mailed to pro se party Mark E. Wisner by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) |
|
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 06/05 3:53 PM
RESPONSE by Plaintiff John Doe KC re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Curry, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Ex Ex.1, | ||
Att: 2 Ex Ex.2 | ||
9 | 9
support
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 06/05 3:51 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of8 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re1 Complaint (attorney) by Plaintiff John Doe KC(Curry, Daniel) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Leave to Amend Complaint
Mon 06/05 3:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re1 Complaint (attorney) by Plaintiff John Doe KC (Curry, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint Ex.1 | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
support
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 05/18 9:47 AM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant The United States of America(Haston, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit - Redacted A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 05/18 9:45 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant The United States of America (Haston, Sarah) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Entry of Appearance
Mon 04/17 12:55 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Virginia Jackson Elliott on behalf of The United States of America (Elliott, Virginia) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED
Fri 03/31 10:09 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by John Doe KC upon Mark E. Wisner served on 3/24/2017, answer due 4/14/2017 (Curry, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA
Fri 03/31 10:07 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by John Doe KC upon The United States of America served on 3/24/2017, answer due 5/23/2017. (Curry, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 03/21 9:59 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff John Doe KC. (Curry, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (attorney)
Tue 03/21 9:48 AM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4126066.), filed by John Doe KC.(Curry, Daniel) |
|
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Tue 03/21 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cv) |
||
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 03/21 3:30 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark E. Wisner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service) (cv) |