Great Plains Trust Company v. Great Plains Annuity Marketing, Inc. et al
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Julie A Robinson |
Referred: | Gwynne E Birzer |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02168 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 3:19 AM CDT |
Defendant
Great Plains Annuity Marketing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Hellerich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Great Plains Trust Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
misc
AO Form 120 Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark
Tue 08/21 12:23 PM
AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (hw) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 08/15 1:47 PM
ORDER granting42 Joint Stipulation and Motion for Order of Dismissal with Retained Jurisdiction. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the parties' Joint Stipulation and Settlement Agreement (filed under seal as Doc. 44) are incorporated into this Order. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 8/15/18. (hw) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
misc
SEALED Exhibits
Tue 08/14 5:16 PM
SEALED EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit 1 re42 MOTION to Dismiss (Long, Dylan) |
|
43 | 43
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal
Tue 08/14 11:32 AM
ORDER granting41 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith the requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on August 14, 2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rs) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 08/13 2:06 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Great Plains Trust Company. (Long, Dylan) |
|
41 | 41
motion
Leave to File Under Seal
Mon 08/13 2:01 PM
Joint SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Great Plains Trust Company (Long, Dylan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
utility
Motions No Longer Referred
Mon 08/13 2:33 PM
MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: 41 Joint SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(adc) |
||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Fri 07/13 11:22 AM
ORDER denying39 Motion to Reopen Case. The parties' Joint Motion to Reopen Proceedings Pending Execution of Settlement Agreement is denied. Rather than reopening this case pending the completion of settlement, the parties are granted an additional thirty days, until August 13, 2018, to file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on July 13, 2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rs) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Reopen Case
Wed 07/11 1:37 PM
Joint MOTION to Reopen Case by Plaintiff Great Plains Trust Company (Long, Dylan) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
order
Administratively Closing Case
Thu 06/14 2:50 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Parties shall file stipulation of dismissal by July 12, 2018. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 6/14/18. (hw) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Status Report
Tue 06/12 1:52 PM
STATUS REPORT by Great Plains Trust Company. (Long, Dylan) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/08 4:42 PM
ORDER EXTENDING STAY OF FURTHER PROCEEDINGS PENDING SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS. The stay in this case shall be extended to June 7, 2018, to allow the parties time to finalize their settlement agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/8/18. |
|
35 | 35
misc
Status Report
Tue 05/08 1:52 PM
STATUS REPORT by Great Plains Trust Company. (Long, Dylan) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 04/09 10:51 AM
ORDER EXTENDING STAY OF FURTHER PROCEEDINGS PENDING SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS. The stay in this case shall be extended to May 7, 2018, to allow the parties to complete settlement negotiations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 4/9/18. |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/06 3:19 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Great Plains Trust Company. (Long, Dylan) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines
Wed 03/07 5:04 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion to Stay Further Proceedings Pending Completion of Settlement Negotiations. This case shall be stayed for 30 days to allows the parties to complete settlement negotiations. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report to the Court on April 6, 2018 if the case has not been dismissed before that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/7/18. |
|
31 | 31
motion
Stay Deadlines
Wed 03/07 1:18 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Plaintiff Great Plains Trust Company (Long, Dylan) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Entry of Appearance
Thu 02/08 4:02 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Dylan M Long on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Long, Dylan) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Fri 01/12 3:20 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Matthew T Swift as to Great Plains Trust Company (Swift, Matthew) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 10/13 8:53 AM
First Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Great Plains Annuity Marketing, Inc., Richard Hellerich.(Lawrence, Daniel) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Fri 10/06 4:04 PM
ORDER. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend26 is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their amended answer no later than October 16, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/6/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sj) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Amend/Correct Document
Fri 10/06 8:27 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct16 Answer to Complaint by Defendants Great Plains Annuity Marketing, Inc., Richard Hellerich (Lawrence, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Answer | ||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 10/03 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Great Plains Annuity Marketing, Inc., Richard Hellerich of First Set of Interrogatories and Second Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Lawrence, Daniel) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 10/03 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Richard Hellerich of First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Lawrence, Daniel) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Deadlines
Fri 09/15 2:47 PM
ORDER. At the request of counsel, the Mediation deadline is extended to 1/26/2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/15/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(sj) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Protective Order
Tue 08/22 12:48 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/21/17. (sj) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 08/04 9:43 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice 9/15/2017; Mediation deadline 12/4/2017; Discovery deadline 3/1/2018; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/8/2018; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2018 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer; Dispositive motion deadline 4/12/2018; Jury Trial set for 12/11/2018 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 427 (JAR) before Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson - estimated trial time 5 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/3/17. (sj) |
|
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Fri 08/04 9:44 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/3/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sj) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/28 12:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Disclosures by Great Plains Trust Company. (Swift, Matthew) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Compliance
Fri 07/28 8:51 AM
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendants Great Plains Annuity Marketing, Inc., Richard Hellerich . (Lawrence, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling
Mon 06/26 1:52 PM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Report of Parties Planning Meeting and copies of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/26/17. (sj) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/22 4:43 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great Plains Trust Company . (Swift, Matthew) |
|
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/22 8:35 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Great Plains Annuity Marketing, Inc., Richard Hellerich.(Lawrence, Daniel) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/22 8:34 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great Plains Annuity Marketing, Inc., Richard Hellerich (Lawrence, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer
Thu 06/08 8:37 AM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until June 22, 2017 for Defendants Richard Hellerich, Great Plains Annuity Marketing, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 06/08/2017. (cv) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Entry of Appearance
Tue 06/06 10:00 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Daniel E. Lawrence on behalf of All Defendants (Lawrence, Daniel) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Entry of Appearance
Tue 06/06 9:58 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ryan K. Meyer on behalf of All Defendants (Meyer, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED
Tue 05/23 1:42 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Great Plains Trust Company upon Richard Hellerich served on 5/18/2017, answer due 6/8/2017 (Swift, Matthew) |
|
10 | 10
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED
Tue 05/23 1:39 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Great Plains Trust Company upon Great Plains Annuity Marketing, Inc. served on 5/18/2017, answer due 6/8/2017 (Swift, Matthew) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Mon 05/22 9:46 AM
ORDER. The Motion to Withdraw or Enter Substitute Counsel8 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/22/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sj) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Substitute Attorney
Thu 05/18 3:59 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Plaintiff Great Plains Trust Company (Burbach, Cheryl) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/16 12:32 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Great Plains Annuity Marketing, Inc., Richard Hellerich. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (cv) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Entry of Appearance
Fri 05/12 3:56 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Matthew T. Swift on behalf of Great Plains Trust Company. (Swift, Matthew) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Entry of Appearance
Fri 05/12 3:52 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael D. Pospisil on behalf of Great Plains Trust Company. (Pospisil, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Entry of Appearance
Fri 05/12 3:42 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John M. Edgar on behalf of Great Plains Trust Company. (Edgar, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
AO Form 120 Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark
Tue 03/21 11:25 AM
AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Burbach, Cheryl) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Designation of Place of Trial
Tue 03/21 11:15 AM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Great Plains Trust Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Burbach, Cheryl) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 03/21 11:14 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Great Plains Trust Company. (Burbach, Cheryl) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (attorney)
Tue 03/21 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4126353.), filed by Great Plains Trust Company.(Burbach, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Registration No. 2279241, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - greatplainsannuity.com | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Tue 03/21 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cv) |