Curry v. Caozheng Corporation
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel D Crabtree |
Referred: | K Gary Sebelius |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-04023 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:28 AM CDT |
Defendant
Caozheng Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emma Curry
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Ying Lin
Terminated: 06/23/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 10/24 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Emma Curry (Michel, Larry) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 10/25 11:35 AM
***Civil Case Terminated.(ht) |
||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 07/07 10:38 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint by Caozheng Corporation.(Aguilera, Alexander) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Thu 07/06 10:36 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion Directing KHRC to Produce Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 7/6/17. (bh) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 07/05 4:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Bates Labeled Documents D000001-D000006 by Caozheng Corporation. (Aguilera, Alexander) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Compel
Mon 07/03 3:04 PM
MOTION to Compel by Defendant Caozheng Corporation (Aguilera, Alexander) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Protective Order
Tue 06/27 2:44 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. The parties shall abide by the terms of the attached order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 6/27/17. (bh) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 06/23 2:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Caozheng Corporation, filed by Emma Curry.(Michel, Larry) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 06/21 3:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time is four days. Discovery deadline 12/22/2017. Dispositive motion deadline 1/24/2018. Mediation deadline 10/20/2017. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 7/26/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/3/2018. Trial set for 10/2/2018 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2018 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 3977627#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 6/21/17. (bh) |
|
9 | 9
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 06/21 10:51 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/21/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/14 11:01 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ying Lin identifying N/A as corporate parent . (Aguilera, Alexander) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/14 10:56 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Ying Lin. (Aguilera, Alexander) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 06/13 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Emma Curry of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Michel, Larry) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Setting Scheduling Conference
Wed 04/19 3:00 PM
INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2017 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 3977627#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting and copies of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due to the magistrate judge by 6/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 4/19/17. (bh) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/18 3:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Ying Lin.(Aguilera, Alexander) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED
Mon 04/03 11:35 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Sheriff Service by Emma Curry upon Ying Lin served on 3/28/2017, answer due 4/18/2017 (Michel, Larry) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 03/22 8:10 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (daw) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 8:14 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ying Lin. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (daw) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 03/21 4:46 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Emma Curry. (Michel, Larry) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (attorney)
Tue 03/21 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4127062.), filed by Emma Curry.(Michel, Larry) |