Woydziak v. Hays, Kansas, City of et al
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | J Thomas Marten |
Referred: | James P O'Hara |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-01064 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 3:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
David Gilan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Timothy Greenwood
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brandon Hauptman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hays, Kansas, City of
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Clayton Hill
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aaron Larson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Colin Roe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cale Woydziak
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago |
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Thu 05/25 4:24 PM
JUDGMENT. In accordance with the Order filed May 25, 2017, the plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 9) is hereby granted. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/25/2017. (mam) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 05/25 3:58 PM
ORDER granting9 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case is dismissed without prejudice to refiling, but subject to the conditions set forth above in this order. The parties shall bear their own costs associated with this case. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 5/25/2017. (mam) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 05/25 12:03 PM
RESPONSE by Defendants David Gilan, Timothy Greenwood, Brandon Hauptman, Hays, Kansas, City of, Clayton Hill, Aaron Larson, Colin Roe re9 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice (Grauberger, Kevin) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 05/05 9:49 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/5/2017. Gregory Schwartz appears for plaintiff. Kevin Grauberger appears for defendant. (AT&T Conference Line.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 05/05 9:40 AM
ORDER regarding motion to dismiss. On 5/5/17, the undersigned magistrate judge convened a telephone scheduling conference pursuant to an order filed on 3/23/17 (ECF No. 4). However, in light of the motion to dismiss (without prejudice) that plaintiff filed on 5/4/17 (ECF No. 9), the scheduling conference was indefinitely postponed. Since an answer has been filed (ECF No. 5), assuming defense counsel gets authority from his clients to consent to dismissal of the case (whether without or with prejudice), the parties must file a stipulation that complies with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). Otherwise defendants' response to the pending motion, under D. Kan. Rule 6.1(d) (2), must be filed by 5/25/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/5/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (O'Hara, James) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Thu 05/04 4:00 PM
Proposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Cale Woydziak (Schwartz, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 05/03 10:44 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by David Gilan, Timothy Greenwood, Brandon Hauptman, Hays, Kansas, City of, Clayton Hill, Aaron Larson, Colin Roe of Defendants' First Discovery Requests to Plaintiff (Grauberger, Kevin) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Service
Fri 04/28 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by David Gilan, Timothy Greenwood, Brandon Hauptman, Hays, Kansas, City of, Clayton Hill, Aaron Larson, Colin Roe of Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Grauberger, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
State Court Records
Wed 04/05 11:50 AM
STATE COURT RECORDS from Ellis County District Court. (Cooper, David) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/27 8:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by David Gilan, Timothy Greenwood, Brandon Hauptman, Hays, Kansas, City of, Clayton Hill, Aaron Larson, Colin Roe.(Cooper, David) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment A, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment B, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment C | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Setting Scheduling Conference
Thu 03/23 4:50 PM
INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2017 at 09:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 4/28/2017. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 4/28/2017. All participants must call the conference line at 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 8914911 for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/23/17. (ss) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 03/22 7:29 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Designation of Place of Trial
Tue 03/21 4:51 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants City of Hays, Kansas, David Gilan, Timothy Greenwood, Brandon Hauptman, Clayton Hill, Aaron Larson, Colin Roe - trial to be held in Wichita. (Cooper, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 03/21 4:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants City of Hays, Kansas, David Gilan, Timothy Greenwood, Brandon Hauptman, Clayton Hill, Aaron Larson, Colin Roe. (Cooper, David) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/21 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ellis County District Court, case number 2017-CV-000024 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4127064.), filed by Clayton Hill, Brandon Hauptman, Colin Roe, City of Hays, Kansas, David Gilan, Timothy Greenwood, Aaron Larson.(Cooper, David) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix B, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix C |