Stauddy et al v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02336 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 3:37 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Unidentified Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Stauddy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Stauddy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 08/24 10:37 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE- originally filed as rec. doc. 10614 in master case 14-md-2592.(mmv) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 03/31 2:24 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 10:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (jls) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 03/21 3:37 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6037750) filed by Sandra Stauddy, Bobby Stauddy.Attorney Edward A. Wallace added to party Bobby Stauddy(pty:pla), Attorney Edward A. Wallace added to party Sandra Stauddy(pty:pla).(Wallace, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |