Givens et al v. Seal et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jay C Zainey |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02341 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:00 AM CDT |
Defendant
Tyler Lindsey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jim Miller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John O'Hern
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Randy Seal
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unidentified Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Danny Ray Givens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ozzie Givens
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 03/07 1:20 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/7/2018.(caa) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
Fri 03/02 11:02 AM
ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT on28 MOTION to Quash Witness Subpoenas for 3/21/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/2/2018.(clc) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Quash
Wed 02/28 2:27 PM
MOTION to Quash Witness Subpoenas by Jason Cuccia, Warren Montgomery, Shea Penton, Tommie Sorrell. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/28/2018.(Menard, Cary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Motion Exhibit M-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Motion Exhibit M-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Motion Exhibit M-3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Motion Exhibit M-4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Motion Exhibit M-5, | ||
Att: 6 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Quash, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Memorandum Exhibit M-1, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Memorandum Exhibit M-2, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Memorandum Exhibit M-3, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Memorandum Exhibit M-4, | ||
Att: 11 Notice of Submission, | ||
Att: 12 Certificate of Service | ||
27 | 27
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 02/28 10:06 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re26 Memorandum. ***This Memorandum and Exhibits must be filed with the Motion to Quash and Notice of Submission. It cannot be filed as a separate entry. Please see the notice of deficient filing for the Motion to Quash.*** (ajn) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
8
pgs
respm
Memorandum
Tue 02/27 4:12 PM
MEMORANDUM filed by Jason Cuccia, Warren Montgomery, Shea Penton, Tommie Sorrell re25 First MOTION to Quash WITNESS SUBPOENAS .(Menard, Cary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit M-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit M-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit M-3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit M-4 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Quash
Tue 02/27 4:00 PM
First MOTION to Quash WITNESS SUBPOENAS by Warren Montgomery, Shea Penton, Jason Cuccia, Tommie Sorrell. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/27/2018.Attorney Cary J. Menard added to party Warren Montgomery(pty:mov), Attorney Cary J. Menard added to party Shea Penton(pty:mov), Attorney Cary J. Menard added to party Jason Cuccia(pty:mov), Attorney Cary J. Menard added to party Tommie Sorrell(pty:mov).(Menard, Cary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit M-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit M-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit M-3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit M-4 | ||
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 02/23 10:12 AM
ORDER Granting23 Motion to Continue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the submission date on20 MOTION for Summary Judgment is Continued from 3/7/2018 to 3/21/2018. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 2/22/2018.(ajn) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Continue
Thu 02/22 9:09 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue by Danny Ray Givens.(Kaplan, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Continue Submission Date on MSJ | ||
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 02/21 9:13 AM
NOTICE regarding oral argument on20 MOTION for Summary Judgment . By Clerk.(jrc) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Request/Statement of Oral Argument
Tue 02/20 3:45 PM
Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Tyler Lindsey, Jim Miller, John O'Hern, Randy Seal regarding20 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Hughes, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 02/20 3:42 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Tyler Lindsey, Jim Miller, John O'Hern, Randy Seal. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/7/2018.(Hughes, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 22 Notice of Submission | ||
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order Set Hearings
Wed 02/14 2:28 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for 3/16/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 2/14/2018.(clc) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
trial
Witness and Exhibit List
Fri 02/09 4:41 PM
Witness and Exhibit List by All Plaintiffs. (Kaplan, Philip) |
|
17 | 17
trial
Witness and Exhibit List
Fri 02/09 3:37 PM
Witness and Exhibit List by Tyler Lindsey, Jim Miller, John O'Hern, Randy Seal. (Hughes, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
Tue 08/29 4:55 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record, Attorney Timothy Thomas Yazbeck, for Danny Ray Givens and Ozzie Givens. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/29/2017. (ajn) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Enroll as Counsel of Record
Mon 08/28 2:28 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Additional Co-Counsel by Danny Ray Givens, Ozzie Givens.(Smith, Randall) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/10 4:46 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Jury Trial set for 4/23/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(jrc) |
|
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form | ||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
Fri 07/07 11:15 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record, Attorney Randall A. Smith, for Danny Ray Givens and Ozzie Givens. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/6/2017. (ajn) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Enroll as Counsel of Record
Wed 07/05 2:30 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record Randall A. Smith by Danny Ray Givens.(Kaplan, Philip) Modified text on 7/5/2017 (ajn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 06/22 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2017 10:10 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/22 7:58 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Tyler Lindsey, Jim Miller, John O'Hern, Randy Seal.(Hughes, Charles) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 06/05 8:35 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/2/17. (jrc) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 05/25 10:54 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint,, by Tyler Lindsey, Jim Miller, John O'Hern, Randy Seal.Attorney Charles M. Hughes, Jr added to party Tyler Lindsey(pty:dft), Attorney Charles M. Hughes, Jr added to party Jim Miller(pty:dft), Attorney Charles M. Hughes, Jr added to party John O'Hern(pty:dft), Attorney Charles M. Hughes, Jr added to party Randy Seal(pty:dft).(Hughes, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/10 8:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to John O'Hern on 4/20/2017, answer due 6/19/2017. (Kaplan, Philip) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/10 8:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Tyler Lindsey on 4/20/2017, answer due 6/19/2017. (Kaplan, Philip) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/10 8:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Jim Miller on 4/20/2017, answer due 6/19/2017. (Kaplan, Philip) |
|
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/10 8:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Randy Seal on 4/20/2017, answer due 6/19/2017. (Kaplan, Philip) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 1:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Tyler Lindsey, Jim Miller, John O'Hern, Randy Seal.(tm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/22 10:04 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (jeg) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 6:10 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6038420) filed by Danny Ray Givens.Attorney Philip Jeremy Kaplan added to party Danny Ray Givens(pty:pla).(Kaplan, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Randy Seal, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Jim Miller, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Tyler Lindsey, | ||
Att: 5 Summons John O'Hern |