Carroll v. Leblanc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | S Maurice Hicks, Jr |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00426 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2020 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
utility
ADI Receipt Entry
Fri 01/19 9:30 AM
Confirmation of receipt of payment from MATTHEW CARROLL in the amount of $291.00. Transaction posted on 1/18/2024. Receipt number ALAWDC-5829432 processed by Finance Import. (crt,Williams, G) |
||
Friday, April 24, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 04/27 10:59 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Matthew C Carroll, David Wade Correctional Center, re:23 Judgment re Report and Recommendations, Order on Report and Recommendations, returned marked: RTS. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Tuesday, March 24, 2020 | ||
utility
ADI Receipt Entry
Tue 03/24 10:08 AM
Confirmation of receipt of payment from MATTHEW CARROLL in the amount of $8.00. Transaction posted on 3/19/2020. Receipt number ALAWDC-4214673 processed by Finance Import. (crt,Adams ADI, K) |
||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment re Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 03/19 2:35 PM
JUDGMENT adopting22 Report and Recommendations re1 Complaint and8 Amended Complaint filed by Matthew C Carroll. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's conclusory claims and his claims regarding programs, conditions of confinement, visitation, medications, telephone, legal access, television, radio, card games, confidentiality of his conviction, and the administrative remedy process be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii) and his claims occurring after 3/16/2017 be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust administrative remedies pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a). Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 3/19/2020. (crt,Keifer, K) |
|
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 01/27 1:31 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re8 Amended Complaint filed by Matthew C Carroll,1 Complaint filed by Matthew C Carroll. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's conclusory civil rights claims and his claims regarding programs, conditions of confinement, visitation, medications, telephone, legal access, television, radio, card games, confidentiality of his conviction, and the administrative remedy process be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii) and his claims occurring after March 16, 2017 be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust administrative remedies pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a). Objections to R&R due by 2/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/27/2020. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
Thursday, September 26, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 09/26 4:15 PM
ORDER adopting20 Report and Recommendations, denying13 Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/26/2019. (crt,McDonnell, D) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 08/02 4:10 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew C Carroll. IT IS RECOMMENDED that motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Doc. 13) be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/2/2019. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 05/15 3:26 PM
ORDER denying18 Motion to Amend/Correct. Denied without prejudice to the right to re-file this motion and outline what changes need to be made to the complaint. Plaintiff must attach a copy of the proposed amended complaint to his motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/15/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 05/13 1:31 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct8 Amended Complaint by Matthew C Carroll. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
utility
ADI Receipt Entry
Wed 05/01 9:25 AM
Confirmation of receipt of payment from MATTHEW CARROLL in the amount of $14.00. Transaction posted on 4/25/2019. Receipt number 0536-3933077 processed by Finance Import. (crt,Adams ADI, K) |
||
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
service
Proposed Summons
Mon 03/18 10:33 AM
PROPOSED USM 285 forms as to M Dauzat, Goodwin, S Hayden, J Leblanc, L Nail, submitted by Matthew C Carroll.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Exhibit
Mon 03/04 10:29 AM
EXHIBIT re1 Complaint by Matthew C Carroll.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Copy Work or Form Request (Public Entry No NEF)
Tue 02/26 9:10 AM
REQUEST from Matthew C Carroll for forms for service through the U.S. Marshals Service. Clerk mailed six (6) copies of Form USM-285 Process Receipt and Return on 02/26/2019. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Exhibit
Thu 01/10 10:23 AM
EXHIBITS re13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Matthew C Carroll.(crt,Haik, K) (Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Cover letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Att: 3 (1/10/2019) Copywork fee letter | ||
13 | 13
motion
Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction
Thu 01/10 10:20 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Matthew C Carroll.(crt,Haik, K) (Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Cover letter, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
Att: 4 (1/10/2019) Copywork fee letter | ||
utility
Motions Transferred
Thu 01/10 10:21 AM
Motions Transferred regarding13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Haik, K) |
||
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Copy Work or Form Request (Public Entry No NEF)
Thu 12/13 9:31 AM
REQUEST from Matthew C Carroll for status update and legal advice. Clerk mailed copy of Docket Sheet and Copy Work Letter on 12/13/2018. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope, | ||
Att: 2 Copy Work Letter | ||
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
utility
ADI Receipt Entry
Wed 08/15 10:03 AM
Confirmation of receipt of payment from MATTHEW CARROLL in the amount of $11.00. Transaction posted on 8/13/2018. Receipt number 0536-3725990 processed by Finance Import. (crt,Adams ADI, K) |
||
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
utility
ADI Receipt Entry
Thu 06/28 8:44 AM
Confirmation of receipt of payment from MATTHEW CARROLL in the amount of $16.00. Transaction posted on 6/15/2018. Receipt number 0536-3680661 processed by Finance Import. (crt,Adams ADI, K) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Copy Work or Form Request (Public Entry No NEF)
Tue 04/10 4:39 PM
REQUEST from Matthew C Carroll for copy of exhibit attached to document1 . Clerk mailed copy of exhibit attached to document1 on 4/10/2018. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (crt,ThomasSld, T) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Copy Work or Form Request (Public Entry No NEF)
Fri 03/23 9:59 AM
REQUEST from Matthew C Carroll for information on service on defendants. Clerk mailed attached Copy Work Letter concerning interim review along with copy of Docket Sheet on 03/23/2018. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope, | ||
Att: 2 Copy Work Letter | ||
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Copy Work or Form Request (Public Entry No NEF)
Wed 02/28 8:54 AM
REQUEST from Matthew C Carroll for status of case. Clerk mailed copy of docket sheet on 2/28/2018. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (crt,ThomasSld, T) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
utility
ADI Receipt Entry
Wed 10/25 8:58 AM
Confirmation of receipt of payment from MATTHEW CARROLL in the amount of $10.00. Transaction posted on 10/20/2017. Receipt number 0536-3492339 processed by Finance Import. (crt,Adams ADI, K) |
||
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 08/10 2:45 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against M Dauzat, S Hayden, J Leblanc, L Nail, Goodwin filed by Matthew C Carroll.(crt,ThomasSld, T) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Sec P - Order Amend/ARP/Summons/Timely
Tue 07/18 11:06 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint/petition. Pro Se Response due by 8/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/18/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Tue 03/28 10:21 AM
ORDER denying3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/27/2017. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/24 4:49 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 03/23/2017. (crt,Williams, L) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Wed 03/22 11:28 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Tue 03/21 11:14 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Matthew C Carroll.(crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/21 11:11 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew C Carroll.(crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 11:09 AM
COMPLAINT against M Dauzat, S Hayden, J Leblanc, L Nail filed by Matthew C Carroll.(crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Letter, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/22 11:05 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M) |