Coleman v. Berryhill
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Gary A Fenner |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00205 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Clerk's Judgment
Tue 05/15 10:52 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
25 | 25
12
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/15 10:47 AM
ORDER affirming decision of Commissioner re1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT, filed by Barbara Ann Coleman. Signed on 5/15/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
soc_sec
Social Security reply brief by plaintiff
Thu 02/08 12:56 PM
PLAINTIFFS SOCIAL SECURITY REPLY BRIEF filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Barbara Ann Coleman.(Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Fri 01/19 10:30 AM
ORDER granting22 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. New deadline: Plaintiff social security reply brief due by 2/8/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 1/19/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Fri 01/19 10:02 AM
MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines filed byCathleen A Shine on behalf of Barbara Ann Coleman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/2/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
soc_sec
Social Security brief by defendant
Fri 12/29 3:02 PM
DEFENDANTS SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEF filed by Jerry L. Short on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Plaintiff social security reply brief due by 1/19/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Short, Jerry) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Tue 11/28 2:38 PM
ORDER granting19 second motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. New deadline: Defendant social security brief due by 12/29/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 11/28/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Tue 11/28 2:25 PM
Second MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines up to and including December 29th to file Defendant's BRIEF filed byJerry L. Short on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/12/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Short, Jerry) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Tue 10/31 8:57 AM
ORDER granting17 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. New deadline: Defendant social security brief due by 11/29/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 10/31/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Fri 10/27 2:29 PM
First MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines up to and including November 29th to file Defendant's BRIEF filed byJerry L. Short on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/13/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Short, Jerry) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
soc_sec
Social Security brief by plaintiff
Mon 09/18 11:52 AM
PLAINTIFFS SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEF filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Barbara Ann Coleman. Defendant social security brief due by 10/30/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Shine, Cathleen) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Mon 09/18 8:50 AM
ORDER granting13 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. New deadline: Plaintiffs social security brief due by 9/22/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 9/18/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
notice
Notice of Docket Modification
Mon 09/18 11:28 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 9/16/2017 as Document No. 14, PLAINTIFFS SOCIAL SECURITY REPLY BRIEF. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu) |
||
Saturday, September 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
soc_sec
Social Security reply brief by plaintiff
Sat 09/16 4:09 PM
PLAINTIFFS SOCIAL SECURITY REPLY BRIEF filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Barbara Ann Coleman.(Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Fri 09/15 8:11 PM
MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines filed byCathleen A Shine on behalf of Barbara Ann Coleman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/29/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Thu 08/17 8:37 AM
ORDER granting11 Second motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. New deadline: Plaintiffs social security brief due by 9/15/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 8/17/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Wed 08/16 5:20 PM
MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines filed byCathleen A Shine on behalf of Barbara Ann Coleman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/30/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Fri 07/14 8:24 AM
ORDER granting9 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. New deadline: Plaintiffs social security brief due by 8/16/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 7/14/17 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Thu 07/13 4:19 PM
MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines filed byCathleen A Shine on behalf of Barbara Ann Coleman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/27/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
ssanswer
Answer to Social Security complaint
Mon 06/05 3:52 PM
ANSWER to Social Security complaint filed by Jerry L. Short on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Plaintiffs social security brief due by 7/17/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court (Short, Jerry) |
|
7 | 7
soc_sec
Submission of administrative record
Mon 06/05 3:51 PM
SUBMISSION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Jerry L. Short on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill.(Attorney Jerry L. Short added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Short, Jerry) |
|
Att: 1 001 Certification Page 05 21-2017 | ||
Att: 2 002 Court Transcript Index 05 21-2017 | ||
Att: 3 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 12 04-2010 | ||
Att: 4 004 Payment Documents and Decisions 12 04-2010 | ||
Att: 5 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 12 04-2010 | ||
Att: 6 006 Non Disability Related Development 12 04-2010 | ||
Att: 7 007 Disability Related Development 12 04-2010 | ||
Att: 8 008 Medical Records 12 04-2010 Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 009 Medical Records 12 04-2010 Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 010 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 01 12-2012 | ||
Att: 11 011 Payment Documents and Decisions 01 12-2012 | ||
Att: 12 012 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 01 12-2012 | ||
Att: 13 013 Non Disability Related Development 01 12-2012 | ||
Att: 14 014 Disability Related Development 01 12-2012 | ||
Att: 15 015 Medical Records 01 12-2012 Part 1, | ||
Att: 16 016 Medical Records 01 12-2012 Part 2, | ||
Att: 17 017 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 08 22-2014 | ||
Att: 18 018 Payment Documents and Decisions 08 22-2014 | ||
Att: 19 019 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 08 22-2014 | ||
Att: 20 020 Non Disability Related Development 08 22-2014 | ||
Att: 21 021 Disability Related Development 08 22-2014 | ||
Att: 22 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 23 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 24 024 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 05 21-2017 | ||
Att: 25 025 Payment Documents and Decisions 05 21-2017 | ||
Att: 26 026 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 05 21-2017 | ||
Att: 27 027 Non Disability Related Development 05 21-2017 | ||
Att: 28 028 Disability Related Development 05 21-2017 | ||
Att: 29 029 Medical Records 05-21-2017 | ||
Sunday, April 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
soc_sec
Return of service of Social Security Complaint
Sun 04/30 4:54 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint. United States Attorney General served on 4/10/2017. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
5 | 5
soc_sec
Return of service of Social Security Complaint
Sun 04/30 4:53 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint. Commissioner of Social Security, Office of the Regional Counsel served on 4/6/2017. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
soc_sec
Return of service of Social Security Complaint
Tue 04/11 4:46 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 4/6/2017 Social security answer due by 6/5/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 7/5/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 04/03 10:55 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Ellis, Lindsey) |
||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion to Reassign/Transfer Case
Fri 03/31 9:10 AM
ORDER granting2 motion to reassign/transfer case. Case reassigned to District Judge Gary A. Fenner for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth no longer assigned to the case. Signed on 3/31/2017 by Magistrate Judge Matt J. Whitworth. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Price, Jackie) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Reassign/Transfer Case
Tue 03/28 4:18 PM
MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Barbara Ann Coleman. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/11/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
sscmp
Complaint - Social Security
Tue 03/21 3:06 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT Barbara Ann Coleman. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0866-5222081) Service due by 6/19/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Shine, Cathleen) Main Document 1 replaced on 3/21/2017 to correct clerical error (Ellis, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Assignment
Tue 03/21 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to Plaintiff's Counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 4/11/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ellis, Lindsey) |