Duncan v. Gonzales
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | A Joe Fish |
Referred: | Paul D Stickney |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00796 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:11 AM CDT |
Defendant
Lorena Gonzales
|
|
Plaintiff
Arzie Wayne Duncan
#568368 TDCJ Hutchins State Jail 1500 East Langdon Road
Dallas, TX 75241 |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Fri 05/26 10:53 AM
JUDGMENT: It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915A and 1915(e). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/26/2017) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Fri 05/26 10:51 AM
Order Accepting the8 findings, conclusions and recommendation of the magistrate judge. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/26/2017) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 05/26 10:54 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10, 11. Fri May 26 10:54:17 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 05/25 12:10 PM
OBJECTION filed by Arzie Wayne Duncan re:8 Findings and Recommendations on Case. (aaa) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Wed 05/10 11:19 AM
FINDINGS CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to the provisions of28 U.S.c. § 636(b) and an order of the District Court, this case has been referred to the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court recommends that the complaint be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915A and 1915(e). (see order) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 5/10/2017) (mcrd) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 05/10 11:20 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Wed May 10 11:20:04 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 05/03 9:56 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed May 3 09:56:55 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 05/03 9:56 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) Arzie Wayne Duncan #568368 (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 5/1/2017) (ykp) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/27 2:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Lorena Gonzales. (ykp) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 04/27 2:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lorena Gonzales filed by Arzie Wayne Duncan. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order And Notice of Deficiency
Thu 04/06 3:38 PM
Order and Notice of Deficiency: Arzie Wayne Duncan must address the following deficiency: Civil rights pleadings are not filed on the appropriate form. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 4/6/2017) (sss) |
|
Att: 1 IFP Form, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 04/06 3:38 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Thu Apr 6 15:38:32 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT against Lorena Gonzales filed by Arzie Wayne Duncan. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (epm) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Tue 03/21 4:06 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (epm) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Fish
Tue 03/21 4:06 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Stickney (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] index and to the prior sanctions found within the[LINK:circuit] index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 03/21 4:08 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Mar 21 16:08:36 CDT 2017 (crt) |