Candib v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00799 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 3:48 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Thomas P Schmalzried, MD
|
|
Plaintiff
Joel Candib
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Tue 10/06 11:10 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal. (chmb) |
||
Friday, October 02, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Fri 10/02 7:06 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice re1 Complaint,,,,, by Joel Candib. (Blatt, Gayle) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 01/17 12:30 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Wendy Behan withdrawn and Gayle M. Blatt shall remain as counsel for Plaintiff Joel Candib. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/17/2019) (chmb) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 01/17 12:17 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Wendy Behan filed by Joel Candib (Blatt, Gayle) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 01/11 1:56 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER - Before the Court is Movant Wendy Behan's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs filed in 3:13-cv-03162-K and 3:17-cv-00799-K. The Motion(s) are denied without prejudice to re-file. After CONFERRING with opposing counsel, Movant may file another motion that contains the required certificate of conference. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/11/2019) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 01/09 4:30 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Wendy Behan filed by Joel Candib (Blatt, Gayle) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 1:20 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson Inc, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional Corporation filed by Joel Candib. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8289368) Clerk to issue summons(es). Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Behan, Wendy) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Related Case |