French v. Fisher et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David A Ezra |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00248 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:06 AM CDT |
Counter Defendant
Jordan French
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Jesse Boskoff
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Darius Fisher
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jesse Boskoff
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Darius Fisher
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
First Page Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jordan M. French
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
210 | 210
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 08/12 4:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David A. Ezra: Motion Hearing held on 8/2/2019 re203 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Darius Fisher (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Angela Hailey.)(td) |
|
motion
Withdraw Document
Mon 08/12 4:23 PM
ORAL MOTION to Withdraw203 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Darius Fisher. (td) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Enforce Settlement Order on Motion to Withdraw
Mon 08/12 4:24 PM
ORAL ORDER WITHDRAWING203 Motion to Enforce Settlement; GRANTING [] Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (td) |