Sinclair, Erik et al v. PGA, Inc.
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | William M Conley |
Referred: | Stephen L Crocker |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00224 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 3:51 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
PGA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Erik Sinclair
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PGA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas P. Bannister
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan W. Bergeman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy R. Buck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy J. Danley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Krall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blaine Krohn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale B. Mills
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wyly D. Scheibe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Schilling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erik Sinclair
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
124 | 124
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/03 2:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal. (Ho, Yingtao) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
123 | 123
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement
Fri 06/28 8:18 AM
ORDER granting118 Joint Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/27/19. (jat) |