Joshua David Mellberg LLC v. Szigeti
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Michelle H Burns |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00835 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 3:28 AM MST |
Defendant
Robert Szigeti
|
|
Plaintiff
Joshua David Mellberg LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Judgment - Default
Tue 07/11 4:09 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT: Ordered granting the Motion for Default Judgment Without Hearing (Doc.12 ). FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that plaintiff, Joshua David Mellberg, L.L.C. d/b/a J.D. Mellberg Financial, recover of the defendant Robert Sziegit, the sum of $103,324.40, plus costs and interest according to law from the date of this judgment until the entire amount is paid. This judgment is entered by the Clerk at the request of the plaintiff and upon affidavit that said amount is due, in accordance with Rule 55(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/11/17. (EJA) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Declaration
Fri 05/19 4:00 PM
DECLARATION of David G. Bray in Support of an Award of Attorneys Fees and Non-Taxable Costs as Part of Plaintiffs Default Judgment Without a Hearing by Plaintiff Joshua David Mellberg LLC. (Bray, David) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Statement
Fri 05/19 3:57 PM
STATEMENT of Plaintiff's Verified Statement of Taxable Costs by Plaintiff Joshua David Mellberg LLC. (Bray, David) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit
Fri 05/19 3:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of David G. Bray //Affidavit of Sum Certain by Plaintiff Joshua David Mellberg LLC. (Bray, David) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Application for Entry of Default
Fri 05/19 3:52 PM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default Judgment Without Hearing by Plaintiff Joshua David Mellberg LLC against Robert Szigeti. (Bray, David) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 04/28 8:53 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Robert Szigeti. (KGM) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Application for Entry of Default
Thu 04/27 2:41 PM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Joshua David Mellberg LLC against Robert Szigeti.(Bray, David) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service Executed
Tue 04/25 4:30 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Joshua David Mellberg LLC: Proof of Service re: Proof of Service upon Robert Szigeti on 3/24/17. (Bray, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Thu 04/13 2:57 PM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))
Mon 04/10 9:41 AM
Order that Joshua David Mellberg LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/8/2017 at 04:30 PM before Judge G Murray Snow.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 9:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Robert Szigeti. (LSP) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Tue 03/21 9:51 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Joshua David Mellberg LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 03/21 9:50 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14035551. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-835-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached.(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/21 9:48 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joshua David Mellberg LLC. (Submitted by David Bray) (LSP) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Tue 03/21 9:47 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Joshua David Mellberg LLC. (Submitted by David Bray) (LSP) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 9:46 AM
MOTION/Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14035551 filed by Joshua David Mellberg LLC. (Submitted by David Bray)(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 26 pgs Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |