Reeder v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00842 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 1:49 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheri Reeder
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Fri 03/05 1:43 PM
ORDER granting Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice (doc. 21845 in Lead MDL 15-2641 . Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. See Order for List of Member Cases. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/21. (MAP) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 03/21 12:12 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-842-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 12:10 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14037444 filed by Sheri Reeder.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |