Niedermeyer v. Mascher et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Referred: | Bridget S Bade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-08056 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 07/10 2:04 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jason Douglas Niedermeyer. Reason for return: Return to Sender, Refused. Document number8 . (LAD) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Clerks Judgment
Mon 06/12 3:21 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed April 10, 2017, judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's order. (LAD) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Mon 04/10 12:13 PM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Jason Douglas Niedermeyer. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/10/17. (SLQ) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 04/10 11:59 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc.2 ) is granted. The Complaint (Doc.1 ) is dismissed for failure to comply with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 3.4 and Rules 8 and 10(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/10/17. (SLQ) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 04/06 10:45 AM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint by Jason Douglas Niedermeyer. (SLQ)(2 pages, styled as a letter to Mr. Karth) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment
Tue 03/21 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (LAD) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 03/21 3:12 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jason Douglas Niedermeyer. (LAD) (4 pages) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/21 3:11 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Douglas Niedermeyer. (LAD) (2 pages) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 3:09 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Jason Douglas Niedermeyer. (LAD) (10 pages) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |