Lorraine Dickson v. Cantil-Sakauye et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02167 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 3:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Tani G. Cantil-Sakauye
|
|
Defendant
Jim Fox
|
|
Defendant
Richard A. Honn
|
|
Defendant
Catherine D. Purcell
|
|
Plaintiff
Lorraine Dickson
an individual 1800 N. Bristol Ave., Suite C-457
Santa Ana, CA 92807 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Wed 08/09 12:09 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,8 filed by Lorraine Dickson. CCA # 17-55811 This appeal is dismissed for failure toprosecute.This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. (mat) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Fri 06/09 11:35 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-55811 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals8 as to plaintiff Lorraine Dickson. (jp) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
Filing Fee Letter (A-15CV)
Wed 06/07 1:46 PM
FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiff Lorraine Dickson, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,8 . In Forma Pauperis was denied 6/2/17. (mat) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Leave to Appeal IFP
Tue 06/06 8:14 AM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: denying6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (mat) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Wed 06/07 1:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Lorraine Dickson. Appeal of Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60),5 Filed On: 4/27/17; Entered On: 4/27/17. [In forma pauperis filed with this notice of appeal.] (mat) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/05 4:22 PM
MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Lorraine Dickson. (mat) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 04/27 2:52 PM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis3 is hereby DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for the following reasons: Immunity as to Judicial Defendants. Failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. See Attachment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately.(MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Tue 03/21 1:34 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Lorraine Dickson. (esa) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/21 1:17 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Lorraine Dickson. (esa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Referred)
Tue 03/21 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT filed against defendants Tani G. Cantil-Sakauye, Jim Fox, Richard A. Honn, Catherine D. Purcell Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J Standish, filed by Plaintiff Lorraine Dickson. (esa) |
|
Att: 1 part 2 |